Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cummins Starla, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case against Toyota Santa Monica, represented by Rau Laurie D. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rita Miller presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management129 days |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2017 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: June 23, 2017COMPLAINT 1. ACTION FOR RESCISSION BASED ON MISTAKE; ETC
Date: June 06, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-06-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 11, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 23, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: July 10, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.