Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lombard Kristina, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by The Myers Law Group A.P.C., against Baldwin Park City Of, represented by Tafoya & Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Ruth Ann Kwan presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2017 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions362 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time362 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN
Date: June 30, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN
Date: July 18, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION ;ETC
Date: June 01, 2017DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: July 31, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 29, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: February 27, 2018Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.