Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Luebke Brett, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fiore Mauro Jr., against Automobile Club Of Southern California, Brent Air Towing Inc. Doe 1, Yin Tong, represented by Karlin Charles I., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura A. Seigle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 18, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 08, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION FOR LEAVE
Date: September 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION FOR...)
Date: September 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: September 11, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION NO. 6
Date: October 01, 2019Motion to Tax Costs
Date: December 03, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: December 31, 2019COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: June 01, 2017Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: January 14, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -
Date: May 31, 2018Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) -
Date: June 11, 2018ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: June 19, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -
Date: July 17, 2018Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: July 23, 2018BRENT-AIR TOWING INC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 23, 2018CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: July 23, 2018BRENT-MR TOWING INC'S AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 26, 2018Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: April 26, 2019Complaint
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Amended Answer
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Charles I. Karlin)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Trial Continuance or in...))
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice (Appendix of Exhibits and Notice of Lodging of Exhibits)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Proposed Order and Stipulation to Conitue Trial)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Order (Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex-Parte to Shorten Time on Motion for Leave)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF GILBERT PEREZ, III IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To shorten time on motion for...))
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Leave to Amend Response to Request for Admission No. 6)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order with Judgment attached)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of 09/11/2019)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Charles I. Karlin in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For a Trial Continuance or in...))
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Hearing)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/12/2019)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO AM...))
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Peter C.L. Chen)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: January 15, 2020Opposition (Defendants Opposition to plaintiff's Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Notice (Respondent's Notice Electing to Use an Appendix)
Date: January 17, 2020Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:12/4/19)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/15/2020)
Date: January 15, 2020Notice (Notice of Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
Date: May 11, 2020Appeal - Appendix CRC 8.124 Transcript Certified (NOA 12/4/19 B302782)
Date: February 05, 2020Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: May 11, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.