Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Alvarado Ernesto Pavel, Peter K. Levine, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Gopin Albert J., Levine Peter K., Locken Eugene D., Locken Eugene D. D.O. J.D., against Barkodar M.D Leon, Chang Andrew M. M.D., Chang M.D. Andrew M., Sengupta M.D. Veena, Shragg M.D. Bruce A., (total of 11) See All represented by Aitelli John Esq., Dummit Craig S, Lamb Michael Vincent, Levine Harmon Bruce, Wend Christopher P Esq., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Lia Martin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management147 days |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2017 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions113 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 26, 2024Order - Court's order on Demurrer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 13, 2019Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant); West Hills Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Declaration OF HARMON B LEVINE; Filed by: Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant); West Hills Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #5; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Opposition to Mil no. 4; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant); West Hills Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Motion to Continue TRIAL, ETC. Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Declaration In Opposition; Filed by: Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant); West Hills Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 15; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Bruce A. Shragg, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #10; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Trial Brief OF DEFENDANT ANDREW CHANG, M.D. RE: DAMAGES; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Opposition Defendant Chang Oppo to MIL #2; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate Actions; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff); As to: Dean Wilson (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Dean P.A. Wilson (Defendant); West Hills Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Opposition MSJ CHANG; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Andrew M. M.D. Chang (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Opposition to motion; Filed by: Dean P.A. Wilson (Defendant); West Hills Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Bruce A. MD. Shragg (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication; Filed by: Bruce A. MD. Shragg (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Court's Order granting plaintiff's motion to consolidate actions; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Notice Notice of Taking MSJ OFF CALENDAR; Filed by: Andrew M. M.D. Chang (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-07T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Dean Wilson (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Bruce A. Shragg, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 18; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 12; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 7; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Bruce A. Shragg, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 17, 2023Opposition Plaintiff's Opp to Def. Dr. Shragg's MIL 5; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBERS 5; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to MIL no. 11; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition Pltf's opposition to MIL No. 1; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition Pltf's opposition to MIL No. 9; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition Pltf's OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBERS 1; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to MIL no. 13; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter - Willie Anderson, CSR #13385; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Opposition Pltf's opposition to MIL No. 7; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Objection to Notice to Use Videotape; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Order re: MSJ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Reply DEFENDANT CHANG'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MIL #10; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion for New Trail. Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Appellant)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Declaration Declaration Regarding Re-Filing Of Motion; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;B303361, NOA ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial Filed by Defendant West H...)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Appellant)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 20; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 14; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 9; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 4; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Other AFFIRMED AND REVERSED IN PART. (B303361); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Dean, P.A. Wilson (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Other - non-opposition to motion for summary judgment; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order and Protective Order; Filed by: Andrew M. M.D. Chang (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: West Hills Hospital and Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Order Granting Motion for Summary Adjudication of 12-12-18; Filed by: Leon MD Barkodar (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Leon MD Barkodar (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-28T00:00:00Objection to Defendant's Evidence; Supporting Declaration; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by:
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Objection BY DEFENDANT; Filed by: Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant); West Hills Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. Four; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. One; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 3; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00- Justus Balentine, CSR #13859; Filed by:
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 21; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. Two; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. Five; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. Eight; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. Twelve; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-28T00:00:00Reply BY DEFENDANT; Filed by: Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant); West Hills Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. Three; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 3 To Preclude Reference to MICRA; Filed by: Bruce A. Shragg, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. Nine; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. Six; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Trial Brief OPENING; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. Eleven; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by: PETER K. LEVINE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 13; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 18; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 11; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Witness List JOINT; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 7; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 4; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #1; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by:
Date: 2023-09-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Bruce A. Shragg, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 14; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #7; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #3; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 12; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Declaration of John S. Cayley Pursuant to Court Rule 3.57; Filed by: Bruce A. Shragg, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 10; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #2; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 5; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #9; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Bruce A. Shragg, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #4; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Joinder No. 4; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Joinder No.2; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition to Mil no. 3; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition Defendant Chang Oppo to MIL #6; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition to Mil no.1; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Bruce A. Shragg, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 9; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 3; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff); As to: Dean Wilson (Defendant)
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 5; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Joinder No.5; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Updated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff); Result: Entered
Date: 2023-11-14T00:00:00Joinder No. 1; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition to Mil no. 6; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition Defendant Chang Oppo to MIL #3; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition Defendant Chang Oppo to MIL #5; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 6; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Bruce A. Shragg, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00No. 3; Filed by: Bruce A. Shragg, M.D. (Defendant); As to: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. Seven; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. Ten; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. Thirteen; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 23; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 17; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 9; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 17; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 8; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #8; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 6; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Opposition TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 19; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Declaration of John Aitelli; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 19; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 13; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 8; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Confidential Declaration; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Document:Motion for Leave Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Mtn for Summary Adjud of Issues Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs of Dean Wilson, Filed by Plain...)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Confidential Motion Under Seal; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter - Kerry Murphy, CSR #13626; Filed by:
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: West Hills Hospital and Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Order - Jina Kaye Soto, CSR #7783; Filed by:
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Order on Defendant West Hills Hospital's Motion to Continue Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Statement of the Case PROPOSED JOINT NEUTRAL STATEMENT; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Order Court's Order Re: CCP 170.6; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by:
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-11-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 10; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 5; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 15; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 22; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants' MIL no. 6; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-21T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-08-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions AMENDED at 9-14-23 hearing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Trial and Final Status Conference; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine MIL #6; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine DEFENDANT ANDREW CHANG MIL #11; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 11; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Trial Brief OF DEFENDANT ANDREW CHANG, M.D. Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Joinder No. 6; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Bruce A. Shragg, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Opposition to Mil no. 2; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Joinder No. 3; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition Defendant Chang Oppo to MIL #4; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition to Mil no. 5; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 4; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition Defendant Chang Oppo to MIL #1; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 1; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 6; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2023-09-13T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Bruce A. Shragg, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1; Filed by: West Hills Hospital (Defendant); Dean Wilson, P.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-08-01T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion in Limine No. One; Filed by: Leon Barkodar, M.D (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Opposition Pltf's opposition to MIL No. 11; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition Pltf's opposition to MIL No. 4; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to MIL no. 1; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Reply TO OPPOSITION TO CHANG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ernesto Pavel Alvarado (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Andrew M. Chang, M.D. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: June 26, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: June 28, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 17, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 09, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 20, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: September 18, 2017Proof of Service by Mail -
Date: October 04, 2018Other - - Other - non-opposition to motion for summary judgment
Date: November 14, 2018Other - - Other - Non-Opposition to Defendant Leon Barkodar, M.D.'s Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 27, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: November 28, 2018Notice - Notice of Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Veena Sengupta, M.D.
Date: November 28, 2018Motion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate Actions
Date: December 17, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: December 12, 2018Opposition - Opposition to motion
Date: January 23, 2019Opposition - Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 14, 2019Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication
Date: January 25, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 25, 2019Order - COURT'S ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS
Date: February 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 05, 2019Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: March 25, 2019Notice of Motion
Date: April 04, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 04, 2019Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, ETC.
Date: April 08, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO AMENDED MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, ETC.
Date: April 30, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. TEN
Date: June 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. SEVEN
Date: June 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. ELEVEN
Date: June 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. ONE
Date: June 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. THREE
Date: June 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. NINE
Date: June 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. EIGHT
Date: June 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. FIVE
Date: June 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. TWO
Date: June 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. THIRTEEN
Date: June 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. FOUR
Date: June 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. TWELVE
Date: June 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. SIX
Date: June 18, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO MICRA
Date: June 19, 2019Notice of Joinder - NOTICE OF JOINDER (NAME EXTENSION) TO MOTION IN LIMINE 9
Date: June 24, 2019Notice of Joinder - NOTICE OF JOINDER (NAME EXTENSION) TO MOTION IN LIMINE 6
Date: June 24, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15
Date: July 16, 2019Notice of Joinder - NOTICE OF JOINDER (NAME EXTENSION) TO MOTION IN LIMINE 4
Date: June 24, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL #8
Date: July 17, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL #10
Date: July 17, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL #7
Date: July 17, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 18
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14
Date: July 16, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL #3
Date: July 17, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL #9
Date: July 17, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL #1
Date: July 17, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL #4
Date: July 17, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL #2
Date: July 17, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL #6
Date: July 17, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL #5
Date: July 17, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT ANDREW CHANG MIL #11
Date: July 23, 2019Notice - NOTICE INDEX OF EXHIBITS OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: July 26, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO CHANG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: August 13, 2019Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. ONE
Date: August 14, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: September 24, 2019Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: October 01, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRAIL.
Date: October 08, 2019Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: November 15, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE MOTIONS FOR DETERMINA...)
Date: November 13, 2019Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING CONFIDENTIAL MOTION UNDER SEAL
Date: November 15, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION ...)
Date: December 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL; HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH...)
Date: December 16, 2019Motion to Tax Costs
Date: February 03, 2020Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: January 28, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF GUZE RE RE-FILING OF MOTION FOR DETER OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: February 07, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION REGARDING RE-FILING OF MOTION
Date: February 06, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: February 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)
Date: February 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS OF DEAN WILSON, FILED BY PLAIN...)
Date: September 23, 2020Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: July 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S COMPLIANCE WITH DEFEN...)
Date: February 02, 2021Order - ORDER ON DEFENDANT WEST HILLS HOSPITAL'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: August 11, 2021Motion to Tax Costs
Date: June 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION TO TAX COSTS; . STATUS CONFERENCE RE ADR)
Date: July 06, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 19
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 23
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 18
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 21
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 20
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: August 01, 2023Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 06, 2020Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 25, 2020Order - Order Granting Motion for Summary Adjudication of 12-12-18
Date: December 12, 2018APPENDIX I OF II OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT VEENA SENGUPTA, M.D.
Date: September 07, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY ANDREW M. CHANG, M.D. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (C.C.P. SECTION 437C), ETC
Date: September 12, 2018EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: September 18, 2018DECLARATION OF LEON BARKODAR, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: September 18, 2018SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: September 18, 2018Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 22
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13
Date: August 01, 2023UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE ;ETC
Date: May 31, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2017DEFENDANT, DEAN WILSON P.A'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 31, 2017ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2017DEFENDANT, LEON BARKODAR, M.D.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 07, 2018NOTICE OF RULING DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 14, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: June 13, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 19, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: August 02, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: August 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: August 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: August 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: August 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: August 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: August 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBERS 5
Date: August 08, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION PLTF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBERS 1
Date: August 08, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: August 01, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 19
Date: August 02, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. (18) EIGHTEEN
Date: August 02, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Complaint (1st)
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Amended Proof of Service of Notice of Motion for Summary Judmgment
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (and Protective Order)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Other - (Non-Opposition to Defendant Leon Barkodar, M.D.'s Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Other - (non-opposition to motion for summary judgment)
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (re Summary Judgment of Defendant Veena Sengupta, M.D.)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice (of Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant Veena Sengupta, M.D.)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Order (granting summary judgment on behalf of defendant Veena Sengupta, MD)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Notice (of taking he December 10, 2018 post-mediation status conference off calendar)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication))
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Order Granting Motion for Summary Adjudication of 12-12-18
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/07/2019)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate (Actions)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 01/07/2019)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Opposition (MSJ CHANG)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Evidence; Supporting Declaration)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice (CORRECTED NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Opposition ( to motion)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Taking MSJ OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Review in Case BC663434; Case Management Conf...))
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Court's Order granting plaintiff's motion to consolidate actions
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate; Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Compel Physi...))
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial, etc.))
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF HARMON B LEVINE)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance of Final Status Conference and Order)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice (OF RULING DENYING DEFENDANT ANDREW M. CHANG, M.D.?S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL.)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial Final Status Conference a...))
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (In Opposition)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order advancing the He...))
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Reply (BY DEFENDANT)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to First Amend...))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Order (- Court's order on Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Response (TO DEFENDANT WILSON?S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS NO. 36.)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. Seven)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. Twelve)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. Ten)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. Eleven)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. Thirteen)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. Nine)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. Eight)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. Two)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. One)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. Six)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. Four)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. Three)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. Five)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No 7 To Preclude Improper Expert Testimony on Direct)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6 To Preclude Expert Testimony from Witnesses not Designated)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8 To Limit Plaintiff's Experts to Opinions Expressed at Deposition)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9 To Preclude Plaintiff's from Introducing Documents Withheld in Discovery)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5 To Preclude Plaintiff from Examining Experts as to their Personal Practices)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 To Preclude Lay and Hearsay Criticisms of Medical Care)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3 To Preclude Reference to MICRA)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2 To Preclude Reference to Other Lawsuits)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 10 To Preclude Argument and Questioning Based on "Reptile Theory")
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.1 To Preclude Reference to Insurance/Liability Coverage)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative ...))
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant, Bruce Shragg, M...))
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (to Motion in Limine 4)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (to Motion in Limine 9)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (to Motion in Limine 6)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (to MIL No. 3)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (to MIL No. 10)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (to MIL No. 12)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 13)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 15)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 14)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 18)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 17)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 11)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 12)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 10)
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #6)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #1)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #2)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #7)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #3)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #8)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #5)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #4)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice (Index of exhibits of Motions in Limine)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #10)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (# 12 to Preclude Cumulative Expert Opinion Testimony)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #9)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (DEFENDANT ANDREW CHANG MIL #11)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Declaration (of John S. Cayley Pursuant to Court Rule 3.57)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Trial Brief (OF DEFENDANT ANDREW CHANG, M.D.)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Trial Brief (OF DEFENDANT ANDREW CHANG, M.D. RE: DAMAGES)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF HARMON B. LEVINE PURSUANT TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY COURT RULE 3.57)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Declaration ( OF JOHN AITELLI PURSUANT TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT LOCAL RULE 3.57)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Joinder (No. 3)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Joinder (No.5)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Joinder (No.2)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Joinder (No. 1)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Mil no. 5)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Mil no. 3)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Mil no. 4)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Mil no. 6)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Mil no. 2)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Joinder (No. 6)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Mil no.1)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant Chang Oppo to MIL #4)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant Chang Oppo to MIL #5)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant Chang Oppo to MIL #3)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant Chang Oppo to MIL #6)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant Chang Oppo to MIL #2)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant Chang Oppo to MIL #1)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion in Limine No. 6)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Joinder (No. 4)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Trial Brief (DEFENDANT LEON BARKODAR, M.D.'S GENERAL TRIAL BRIEF #1)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's Opposition to Def. Dr. Shragg's MIL no. 7)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBERS 5)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBERS 1)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to MIL no. 11)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to MIL no. 13)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to MIL no. 1)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's opposition to MIL No. 1)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's Notice of non-opposition to Def Barkodar's MIL Numbers 1, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9 and10)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opp to Def. Dr. Shragg's MIL 5)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's non opposition to Shragg's MIL 1, 2, 3, 4, 6 and 8)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's opposition to MIL No. 7)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's opposition to MIL No. 9)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's opposition to MIL No. 11)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's opposition to MIL No. 4)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's Opposition to Def. Dr. Shragg's MIL no. 11)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's Ntc of non opposition to Def. MIL 2, 3, 5, 6 and 8)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Reply ( TO OPPOSITION TO CHANG'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Exhibit List (PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST -TRIAL JOINT LONG CAUSE SUBMISSION)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion in Limine No. One)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's opposition to Def. Leon Barkodar, M.D.'s Motion in Limine No. two)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Objection (to Notice to Use Videotape)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Order (re MSJ)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter on Motion for Summary Judgment tak...))
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Completion of Long Cause Package; Final ...))
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Order (re: MSJ)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT CHANG'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MIL #10)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (For Mediation In Lieu Of Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of No Opposition to Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Dean Wilson , PA for the C...))
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial of Plaintiff Ernesto Pavel Al...))
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for New Trail.)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to File Motions for Determina...))
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Confidential Motion Under Seal)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodging ( Confidential Motion Under Seal Pursuant to Prior Court Order Therefor)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 11/15/2019)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Briefing Schedule for Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlements)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (CONFIDENTIAL REPLY OF CHANG TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION UNDER SEAL)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Judgment (by Court Under CCP 437c In Favor of Defendant, Dean Wilson PA)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Determination ...))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Amended Notice of Lodging Confidential Opposition to Defendant Bruce Shragg M.D.)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Compliance With Defendants Notice to Appear and Produce at Trial)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Declaration (Of Barkodar In Support Of Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Confidential Declaration)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith...))
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:1/2/2020)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice ( of Entry of Judgment on Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Dean Wilson P.A.)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Opposition ( TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT DEAN WILSON TO CONTINUE OR STAY TRIAL)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Specially Settin...))
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Regarding Re-Filing Of Motion)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF GUZE RE RE-FILING OF MOTION FOR DETER OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Declaration ( of Cheryl P. Robertson)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Reply (BY DEFENDANT, WEST HILLS HOSPITAL, TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling Regarding Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Order (GRANTING GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B303361, NOA 1/2/20;)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/01/2020)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Trial and Final Status Conference)
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs of Dean Wilson, Filed by Plain...))
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice (OF VACATED TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DUE TO COVID-19. NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED FSC)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference Re: Rescheduling of FSC and Jury Tr...))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order re Ex Parte Application for Order to Compel Physical Examination of Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for an Order to Compel Physical Examination of Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial, etc.)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial, etc.))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Lukas Castillo, Custodian of Records for West Hills Hospital and Medical Center)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Motion to Continue (TRIAL, ETC.)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to First Amend...))
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Declaration ( of Darla M. Canon, Esq.)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Amended Motion to Continue Trial, etc.)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Declaration ( of John Aitelli)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Compliance with Defen...))
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER SPECIALLY SETTIN...))
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Advancing the Final Status Conference)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Order (on Defendant West Hills Hospital's Motion to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial Filed by Defendant West H...))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION OF...))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's Opposition to Def. Dr. Shragg's MIL no. 12)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Opposition (Pltf's Opposition to Def. Dr. Shragg's MIL no. 9)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re Completion of Long Cause Package; Final ...))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (- Willie Anderson, CSR #13385)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging Confidential Declaration)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Objection (BY DEFENDANT)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B303361, NOA 1/2/20;)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.