Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Integrative Wellness Management Inc, Jalili Ashkan Dc., Pacific Integrative Medical Center, Santa Monica Wellness Group, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Travieso Arthur J. Esq, against Heath Atlast Llc, Higashi Stephanie, Higashi Wayne Dc, Yang Seo Jung Dc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Yvette M. Palazuelos presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management117 days |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2017 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time313 days |
Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: June 12, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: March 12, 2018Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: October 03, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC
Date: May 31, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 09, 2018Proof-Service/Summons
Date: March 12, 2018Summons
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: February 22, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.