Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Beyond Meat Inc., Proportion Foods Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Don Lee Farms, Don Lee Farms A Division Of Goodman Food Products Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Catalano Robert J., Dillard John G., Platt Daniel Adam, Hueston John, Hussain Safia, (total of 7) See All against Beyond Meat Inc., Blentech Corporation 3Rd Party, Clw Foods Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Miller Anthony, Nelson Mark, (total of 8) See All represented by Bauch Jim Davis, Coelho Ii Gary, Putnam Marvin S., Putnam Marvin Stanley, Washington Laura Robinson, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Malcolm Mackey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management179 days |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions735 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Appearance
Date: November 16, 2021Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference re: Trial Assignment Conference))
Date: August 18, 2022Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (AMENDED)
Date: October 08, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: July 27, 2017Complaint
Date: May 25, 2017Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 9-29-2020 MINUTE ORDER)
Date: October 21, 2020Joinder; Filed by: Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Declaration of Daniel A. Platt in support of Don Lee Farms' Motion; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Errata re Wilson Declaration; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Undertaking Under Section 489.210 C.C.P. in the amount of $10,000; Filed by:
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant); As to: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice OF REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant); As to: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Anthony Miller (Defendant); As to: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Mark Nelson (Defendant); As to: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Jessica Quetsch (Defendant); As to: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Goodman Food Products, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Savage River, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Response to Separate Statement; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Brandon Goodman (Cross-Defendant); As to: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Cross-Defendant); As to: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Document:Opposition Points & Authorities Filed by: Objector 7OB7
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Posting Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Posting Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Document:Order-Protective Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Document:Report of Referee Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Other - Referee's Report and Recommendations RE Motions to Compel Trade Secret Designation; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Don Lee Farms, a division of Goodman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms, a division of Goodman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Declaration of Todd Waldman; Filed by: Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Don Lee Farms, a division of Goodman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Savage River, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Declaration ISO Opposition; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Don Lee Farms, a division of Goodman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Don Lee Farms, a division of Goodman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Order RE Don Lee Farms' Motion for an order to file Documents Under Seal; Filed by:
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Don Lee Farms, a division of Goodman (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Declaration of Yeung in Support of Motion; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Declaration DECLARATION OF EDWARD K. LEE IN SUPPORT; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Declaration ISO Motion to Compel; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Opposition TO BEYOND MEAT INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Exhibit List Compendium; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Notice NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Declaration of Kelli Wilson in Support; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Declaration of Marvin S. Putnam in Support; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Order Granting Pro Hac Vice RE Christopher Y.L. Yeung; Filed by: Savage River Inc (fka) (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Summons on Amended Complaint (1st); Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Don Lee Farms, a division of Goodman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: Don Lee Farms, a division of Goodman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Motion to Seal Documents Under Seal; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Declaration of Brian Levy; Filed by: Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Declaration of Jim Bauch; Filed by: Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Seal to File Under Seal; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Daniel Goodman (Cross-Defendant); As to: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice NOTICE OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Order on Joint Stipulation to Seal Documents; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Notice OF ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION RE: PRETRIAL DEADLINES; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: DON LEE FARMS, a division of GOODMAN FOOD PRODUCTS, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Declaration of Nima H. Mohebbi in Support (Redacted); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Declaration of Tiffany M. Ikeda in Support (Redacted); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication [Redacted]; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Order Re: Application to be Admitted as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: DON LEE FARMS, a division of GOODMAN FOOD PRODUCTS, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Declaration of Justin Fuller in Support (Redacted); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Status Report JOINT; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodging DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Order Re Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Order on Joint Stipulation to Seal; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Lodging DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Declaration of Nathan M. Saper in Support (Redacted); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter -- Dayna Hester #9970; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Joint Statement of the Case; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Conduct Of The Trial in Department SSC-2; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Order For Trial Preparation; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Lodging DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re Return of Document) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Jury Trial (Assignment)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff); As to: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Documents Conditionally Under Seal; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Documents Conditionally Under Seal; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodging of Documents Conditionally Under Seal; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Order re: Referee's Report and Recommendations /January 5, 2022 Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Notice OF ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Declaration of Marvin S. Putnam; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Reply in Support of Request For Judicial Notice; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Proposed Additional Voir Dire Questions; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Notice OF ORDER; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff); As to: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Trial Brief [Optional]; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Joint and Objected to Jury Instructions; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order as to Judge Borenstein, Spring Street Dept. 2, OTR on at 10:00 a.m. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Witness List Joint; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of , Order For Trial Preparation; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Order-Protective Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Complaint Filed by DON LEE FARMS, a division of GOODMAN FOOD PRODUCTS, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Affidavit of Posting Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Blentech Corporation (3rd Party) (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Report of Referee Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Blentech Corporation (3rd Party) (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Notice Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Receipt-Depository Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Receipt-Depository Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Receipt-Depository Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Don Lee Farms, a division of Goodman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Leave to File First Amended Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms, a division of Goodman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Order (Granting Pro Hac Vice RE Christopher Y.L. Yeung) Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to file first amended complaint)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave DON LEE FARMS' NOTICE OF MOTION A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) Filed by Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Don Lee Farms, a division of Goodman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by Don Lee Farms, a division of Goodman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Motion for Order (TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Complaint ((1st)) Filed by Don Lee Farms, a division of Goodman (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian Levy) Filed by Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice ( OF COURTCALL APPEARANCE) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Seal (to File Under Seal) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Don Lee Farms (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Yeung in Support of Motion) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Todd Waldman) Filed by Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Answer (to Second Amended Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Don Lee Farms (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Documents Under Seal) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to File Documents Under Seal...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Declaration ( ISO Opposition) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice ( OF ORDER FILING REFEREE REPORTS UNDER SEAL) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Jim Bauch) Filed by Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF EDWARD K. LEE IN SUPPORT) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date; M...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, DON LEE FARMS, FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Undertaking (Under Section 489.210 C.C.P. in the amount of $10,000) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (3rd) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff); Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice (OF REASSIGNMENT) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PURS...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Receipt-Depository Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Answer Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Notice Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Receipt-Depository Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Receipt-Depository Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Receipt-Depository Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Affidavit of Posting Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Receipt-Depository Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Receipt-Depository Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Receipt-Depository Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Receipt-Depository Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Notice Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Blentech Corporation (3rd Party) (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review : Non-Appearance (Case Review); Co...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Notice Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Defendant); Beyond Meat (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Opposition Points & Authorities Filed by Objector
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance of Case Management Conference) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice (of continuance of hearing) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice ( OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Answer Filed by Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice (of Court call Appearance) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Writ of Attachment Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service) Filed by Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order to unseal Discovery Referee's Rep...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Answer Filed by Brandon Goodman (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Answer (TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by Goodman Products Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion for Sanctions) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Anthony Miller (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ((1st) (1st)) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions ([Redacted]) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Neil G. Nandi) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Jessica Quetsch (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Record Conditionally Under Seal) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Mark Nelson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Answer (TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by Donald Goodman (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Jason P. Stiehl) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Answer Filed by Goodman Food Products, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Daniel Goodman (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Unseal Discovery Referee'...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Answer (TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (4th)) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Jason P. Stiehl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice (of Orders Adopting Referee's Reports and Recommendations) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Reply in Support of Beyond Meat, In...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Jason P. Stiehl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Records in Support of Beyond Meat's...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (AMENDED) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Beyond Meat's Motion to Seal Jessic...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Sanctions) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Certain Exhibits) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice (of Rulings at March 18, 2021 Hearing) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendations) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Orders Re: Joint Stipulations to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Joinder Filed by Proportion Foods, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff Don Lee Farms' Notice of Withdrawal) Filed by Savage River, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Opposition (TO BEYOND MEAT INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice ( of Hearing on MTC) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Motion to Compel) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel A. Platt in support of Don Lee Farms' Motion) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amen...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice ( of Errata re Declarations) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Summons (to 3rd Amended Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re Wilson Declaration) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (fka Savage River dba (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Hearing on Motion...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Order (Re: Application to be Admitted as Counsel Pro Hac Vice) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Objections to Referee's Report...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice (of Order on Joint Stipulation to Seal Documents) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Request For Judicial Notice) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION RE: PRETRIAL DEADLINES) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Court-Ordered Commission ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendation) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER ADOPTING REFEREE?S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendation) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Defendant-Cross-Complainant B...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication ([Redacted]) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Unopposed...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Exhibit List (Compendium) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Marvin S. Putnam in Support) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits to the Declaration...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Kelli Wilson in Support) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendations) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Joint Status Report)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice (OF RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by DON LEE FARMS, a division of GOODMAN FOOD PRODUCTS, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other FOR ORDER DENYING ?CLAWBACK? DEMAND...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendations) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SEAL) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Documents Conditionally Under Seal) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Conditionally Under Seal) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Motion re: (TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINIONS OF WILLIAM R. ACKERMAN) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Nima H. Mohebbi in Support (Redacted)) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Notice (of Order on Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Justin Fuller in Support (Redacted)) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Notice (OF REMOTE APPEARANCE) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Documents Conditionally Under Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by DON LEE FARMS, a division of GOODMAN FOOD PRODUCTS, INC. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice (of Orders Re: Joint Stipulations to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Re Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Notice (of Orders Re: Joint Stipulations to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order to Exclude Testimony and Opinions...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Tiffany M. Ikeda in Support (Redacted)) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Motion re: (TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. ALYSON E. MITCHELL) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication RE: DEFENDANT-CROS...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Nathan M. Saper in Support (Redacted)) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Status Report (JOINT) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Order (Re Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Notice (OF REMOTE APPEARANCE) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Exclude Expert Witness)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Notice (of Order on Joint Stipulation to Seal) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Marvin S. Putnam) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Joint Statement of the Case Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Joint and Objected to Jury Instructions Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Trial Brief ([Optional]) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Witness List (Joint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference re: Trial Assignment Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Proposed Additional Voir Dire Questions Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Notice (Deposition Testimony Designations and Objections) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Order (For Trial Preparation) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re Return of Document) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Assignment))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial (Assignment)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (-- Dayna Hester #9970) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS) Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Summary of the Case Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of , Order For Trial Preparation) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Don Lee Farms (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Beyond Meat, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Readiness Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Conduct Of The Trial in Department SSC-2 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Return of Document)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Reply (and Sahni Dec ISO Demurrer to DLF SAC)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Notice ( of Errata re Declarations)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date; M...))
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian Levy)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Response to Requet for Production No. 65)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Todd Waldman)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice ( OF ORDER FILING REFEREE REPORTS UNDER SEAL)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING BEYOND MEAT, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY KEANDRA Z. BARLOW)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Opposition Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Declaration (Sahni Declaration ISO Statement in Response_REDACTED)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Opposition (REDACTED Opposition to Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Reply (Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Consolidated Hearing Date for Pending Sealing Motions)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel A. Platt in support of Don Lee Farms' Motion)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION RE: PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND ORDER)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment ([Redacted])
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Jim Bauch)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to File Documents Under Seal...))
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of )
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Writ of Attachment
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Declaration (OF LISA E. RUBIN IN SUPPORT OF DON LEE FARMS? APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice (Statement in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order Re May 7, 2021 Hearing on Motions for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Answer to First Amended complaint by electronic service)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Response (Defendant-Cross-Complainant Beyond Meat, Inc.?s Responses to Evidentiary Objections)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order (re: Requests for Production of Documents)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Motion for Order (TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Notice (of Execution of Stipulation and Protective Order)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Motion for an Order Compelling Further Responses)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRANDON GOODMAN IN SUPPORT OF DON LEE FARMS? APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Response to Request for Production No. 65)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to file first amended complaint))
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Order (Granting Pro Hac Vice RE Christopher Y.L. Yeung)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for an Order Compelling Further Responses and/or Production of Documents)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Beyond Meat's Demurrer to the Second Amended Complaint; Declaration of Edward K. Lee)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Neema T. Sahni ISO Motion to File Under Seal)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Don Lee Farms' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File its First Amended Compliant
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order RE: Plaintiff-Cross-Defendant Don Lee Farms' Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of )
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Declaration ( ISO Opposition)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice (of Court call Appearance)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendations)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Notice (CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF REPLY)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Kelli Wilson in Support of Motion to File Records Under Seal [Redacted])
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Don Lee Farms' Notice of Withdrawal of Its Motion for Leave to File Its First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Order-Protective
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Remote Appearance by Gary J. Coelho, II)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOAN MOCKENHAUPT IN SUPPORT OF DON LEE FARMS? APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Reply ( ISO Motion to Uphold Confidentiality_REDACTED)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Affidavit of Posting
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Undertaking (Under Section 489.210 C.C.P. in the amount of $10,000)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Sahni Attesting to Parties' Meet and Confer)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Yeung in Support of Motion)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PURS...))
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Affidavit of Posting
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Amended Complaint (3rd)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Separate Statement (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT-CROSS-COMPLAINANT BEYOND MEAT, INC.?S MOTION FOR AN ORDER:)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Objection (Don Lee Farms' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Brian Levy)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Status Report (JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ((1st) (1st))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Declaration (Of Lapidus In Support Of Opposition To Motion For Leave To File Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Response (Statement in Response to MSJ Opposition)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel))
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Answer (to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Reply in Support of Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF EDWARD K. LEE IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Declaration (Of Mockenhaupt in support of opposition to writ of attachment (unredacted))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion For Leave To File Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Opposition ( TO BEYOND MEAT, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NO. 65)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (proof of electronic service)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Answer (TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Records in Support of Beyond Meat's...))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Amended Complaint (SECOND)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Jason P. Stiehl)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Reply (ISO Motion to Uphold Confidentiality_UNDER SEAL_Face Page)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Declaration (Sahni Declaration ISO Statement in Response_UNDER SEAL_FacePage)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice (of Opposition to Application for Right to Attach Order)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Jason P. Stiehl...))
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW))
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice ( OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Status Report (JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Records in Support of Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Objections to Referee's Report...))
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRANDON GOODMAN IN SUPPORT OF DON LEE FARMS? APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Opposition (to writ of attachment (unredacted))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Reply (Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Marvin S. Putnam in Support)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Kelli Wilson in Support)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLW FOODS, LLC?S DEMURRER TO DON LEE FARMS? COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice (of Orders Adopting Referee's Reports and Recommendations)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Court-Ordered Commission to the State of Texas for Issuance of a Subpoena)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amen...))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other FOR ORDER DENYING ?CLAWBACK? DEMAND...))
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, DON LEE FARMS, FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ...))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Gary Schultz ISO Opposition to Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging Documents Under Seal with Opposition to Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Declaration ( OF LISA E. RUBIN IN SUPPORT OF DON LEE FARMS? APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (REDACTED Declaration of Kelli Wilson ISO Opposition to Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice (of continuance of hearing)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice ( OF COURTCALL APPEARANCE)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Sanctions) of )
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Neil G. Nandi)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Beyond Meat's Motion to Seal Jessic...))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff Don Lee Farms' Notice of Withdrawal)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (for Leave to File Its Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (by defendant Mark Nelson)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Todd J. Densen In Support of Don Lee Farms' Motion)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (AMENDED)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Regarding Pltf Reply in Support of Motion For Leave to File Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (4th))
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION RE: PRETRIAL DEADLINES)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Summons (to 3rd Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS RE: REFEREE'S REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE: BEYOND MEAT'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendations)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Consolidate Related Actions)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice (OF REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Unseal Discovery Referee'...))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Opposition (TO BEYOND MEAT INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS ON STIPULATIONS TO SEAL AND NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO SEAL OFF-CALENDAR)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Report of Referee
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Opposition ( to DLF Motion to Compel De-Designation)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions ([Redacted])
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PURS...) of )
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave DON LEE FARMS' NOTICE OF MOTION A...))
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of )
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Declaration ([Redacted] of Safia Gray Hussain in Support of Don Lee Farms' Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Motion re: (to Uphold Confidentiality - REDACTED)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Don Lee Farms' Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order to unseal Discovery Referee's Rep...))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of )
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re Wilson Declaration)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Yeung ISO Opposition to Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Schultz in support of opposition to writ of attachment (unredacted))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Electronic Service
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER))
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DON LEE FARMS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Opposition (Don Lee Farms' Opposition to Proportion Foods' Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Motion to Seal (to File Under Seal)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on D...))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Marvin S. Putnam in Support of Motion to File Records Under Seal)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Response (Response to DLF Evidentiary Objections)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice ( of Hearing on MTC)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Y.L. Yeung in Support of Beyond Meat Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Notice (of court order regarding Don Lee Farms' right to attach order and writ of attachment)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Reply (Don Lee Farms' Reply In Support of Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to CCP Section 128.7)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance of Marvin S. Putnam and Laura R. Washington at Status Conference)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Certain Exhibits)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant-Cross-Complainant Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Declaration (Of Wilson in support of opposition to writ of attachment (unredacted))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Answer (TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Answer (TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 9-29-2020 MINUTE ORDER)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order re: 170.6 Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Exhibit List (Compendium)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Commission to Take Deposition Outside California
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL...))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Jessica Quetsch?s Opposition to Don Lee Farms? Motion For Sanctions)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Reply in Support of Beyond Meat, In...))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Joint Status Report))
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE DEFENDANT-CROSS-COMPLAINANT BEYOND MEAT, INC.'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Opposition (Don Lee Farms' Opposition to Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Separate Statement)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Record Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Beyond Meat, Inc.'s First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order Deeming Case Nos. BC662838 and 20STCV41390 Related)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Unopposed...))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Objection (in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication and Reply in Support Thereof; [Proposed] Order)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE OF DANIEL A. PLATT AND SAFIA GRAY HUSSAIN AT STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Hearing on Motion...) of )
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL...))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Order (Re: Application to be Admitted as Counsel Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue writ of attachment hearing)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (GRANTING UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits to the Declaration...))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE: 9-29-2020 MINUTE ORDER)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Defendant-Cross-Complainant B...))
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance at Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendation)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Reply (in Further Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendations)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS RE: REFEREE'S REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATION RE: BEYOND MEAT'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel of Record and Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Nima H. Mohebbi [REDACTED])
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff-Cross-Defendant Don Lee Farms' Reply in Support of Motion to Keep Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Opposition (DON LEE FARMS OPPOSITION TO BEYOND MEATS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Documents Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Orders Re: Joint Stipulations to Seal)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendation)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL;))
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Seal Documents and Testimony Lodged and Order)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Objection (to Discovery Referee's March 15, 2022 Report and Recommendation)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER ADOPTING REFEREE?S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION)
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Motion for Order (FOR ORDER DENYING "CLAWBACK" DEMAND PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 2031.285)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (DON LEE FARMS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINIONS OF WILLIAM R. ACKERMAN)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Notice (OF REMOTE APPEARANCE)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL)
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice (of Order on Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (DON LEE FARMS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. ALYSON E. MITCHELL)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication RE: DEFENDANT-CROS...))
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Exclude Dr. Robert Buchanan's Chain-of-Custody (Redacted))
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Re April 19, 2022 Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (DON LEE FARMS MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. ROBERT BUCHANANS CHAIN-OF-CUSTODY OPINIONS)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Notice (of Rulings at March 18, 2021 Hearing)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Jason P. Stiehl...))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDERS ON MOTION TO SEAL AND STIPULATION TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Request For Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff-Cross-Defendant Don Lee Farms' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Laura R. Washington in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Reply (Defendant-Cross-Complainant Beyond Meat, Inc.?s Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Hearing on Motion...))
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice (of Order on Joint Stipulation to Seal Documents)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication ([Redacted])
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Court-Ordered Commission ...))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Response (to Don Lee Farms' Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Marvin S. Putnam)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order ([Heard by Discovery Referee])
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...) of )
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Re: Application of Emily H. Stone for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice (of Orders Re: Joint Stipulations to Seal)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Reply (DON LEE FARMS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. ALYSON E. MITCHELL)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Alyson E. Mitchell (Redacted))
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Motion re: (TO EXCLUDE DR. ROBERT BUCHANANS CHAIN-OF-CUSTODY OPINIONS)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Motion re: (TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. ALYSON E. MITCHELL)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Reply (DON LEE FARMS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF WILLIAM R. ACKERMAN)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and Order to Seal)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice (of Orders Re: Joint Stipulations to Seal)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Status Report (JOINT)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS OF EXPERT RICHARD F. BERO)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Don Lee Farms' Expert Virginia Deibel)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Tiffany M. Ikeda in Support (Redacted))
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Nima H. Mohebbi in Support (Redacted))
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of William R. Ackerman (Redacted))
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Justin Fuller in Support (Redacted))
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice (OF REMOTE APPEARANCE)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Order (Re Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony)
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Trial))
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Expert Dr. Rosa Abrantes-Metz (Redacted))
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Lori Lillienfeld, CSR 6618)
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Notice (OF REMOTE APPEARANCE)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Trial))
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Seal Documents and Order)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order to Exclude Testimony and Opinions...))
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Nathan M. Saper in Support (Redacted))
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT REGARDING PRIOR DLF LITIGATION AND SETTLEMENTS)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Exclude Expert Witness))
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Re Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony)
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATING TO BEYOND MEATS 2019 PATHOGEN TESTING OF AL)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Nima H. Mohebbi in Support of Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Motions in Limine)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Notice (OF REMOTE APPEARANCE)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF INDIVIDUAL CROSS-DEFENDANTS FINANCIAL CONDITION)
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER REGARDING DON LEE FARMS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. ROSA ABRANTES-METZ)
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Tiffany M. Ikeda in Support of Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Notice (of Order on Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Opposition (TO BEYOND MEATS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE POSTTERMINATION EVIDENCE OF CONTAMINATION)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Notice (OF REMOTE APPEARANCE)
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (JOINT EVIDENTIARY TRIAL EXHIBIT BINDERS)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Proposed Additional Voir Dire Questions
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER)
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Objection (TO PLAINTIFF-CROSS-DEFENDANT DON LEE FARMS? OPTIONAL TRIAL BRIEF)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Notice (of Orders on Joint Stipulations to Seal)
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO JOINT STIPULATION)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Seal Designated Deposition Testimony and Objections)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Witness List (Joint)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Joint and Objected to Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (NOTICE OF LODGING TRIAL BINDERS)
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Trial Brief ([Optional])
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Notice (Deposition Testimony Designations and Objections)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Nima Mohebbi in Support of Oppositions to Motions in Limine Nos. 1-3)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Joint Statement of the Case
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial (Assignment)) of )
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Notice (Amended [Proposed] Juror Questionnaire)
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (- Alexander Joko, No. 12272)
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Notice (Joint Summary of Causes of Actions and Defenses)
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Assignment)))
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Conduct Of The Trial in Department SSC-2
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (-- Reagan Evans #8176)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Exhibit List (AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Documents Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Tiffany M. Ikeda [REDACTED])
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Seal Documents and Testimony Lodged and [Proposed] Order)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Laura R. Washington)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice (OF RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SEAL)
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Motion re: (TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINIONS OF WILLIAM R. ACKERMAN)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Elizabeth A. Greenman in Support (Redacted))
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging Trial Binders)
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT DON LEE FARMS BRIEF ON OPEN ISSUES)
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Notice (Beyond Meat, Inc., Mark Nelson, Jessica Roark, and Anthony Miller's Explanation of Open Issues)
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re Return of Document) of )
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 24, 2022Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Return of Document))
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Notice (Amended Joint Summary of Causes of Actions and Defenses)
Date: 2022-10-13T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Order (For Trial Preparation)
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS)
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of , Order For Trial Preparation)
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Marvin S. Putnam)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (-- Dayna Hester #9970)
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Objection (Amended Deposition Testimony Designations and Objections)
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (as to Judge Borenstein, Spring Street Dept. 2, OTR on at 10:00 a.m.)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Readiness Conference))
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Summary of the Case
Date: 2022-10-12T00:00:00Witness List (AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Joint Notice of Lodging Deposition Transcripts)
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (- Alexander Joko, No. 12272)
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/02/2018)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Order (Granting Pro Hac Vice RE Christopher Y.L. Yeung)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to file first amended complaint))
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/08/2018)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel))
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Answer to First Amended complaint by electronic service)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/14/2018)
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DON LEE FARMS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Notice (Statement in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave DON LEE FARMS' NOTICE OF MOTION A...))
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint (SECOND)
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY KEANDRA Z. BARLOW)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Motion re: (to Uphold Confidentiality - REDACTED)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Sahni Attesting to Parties' Meet and Confer)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Notice (of Execution of Stipulation and Protective Order)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Objection (Don Lee Farms' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Brian Levy)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Motion for Order (TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Opposition (Don Lee Farms' Opposition to Proportion Foods' Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Response (Statement in Response to MSJ Opposition)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Declaration (Sahni Declaration ISO Statement in Response_REDACTED)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Declaration (Sahni Declaration ISO Statement in Response_UNDER SEAL_FacePage)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Jim Bauch)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Brian Levy)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Seal (to File Under Seal)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Todd Waldman)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Reply ( ISO Motion to Uphold Confidentiality_REDACTED)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Reply (ISO Motion to Uphold Confidentiality_UNDER SEAL_Face Page)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Neema T. Sahni ISO Motion to File Under Seal)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Beyond Meat's Demurrer to the Second Amended Complaint; Declaration of Edward K. Lee)
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Reply (and Sahni Dec ISO Demurrer to DLF SAC)
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Consolidated Hearing Date for Pending Sealing Motions)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Opposition ( to DLF Motion to Compel De-Designation)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Declaration ( ISO Opposition)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Answer (to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to File Documents Under Seal...))
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 08/21/2019)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice ( OF ORDER FILING REFEREE REPORTS UNDER SEAL)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Yeung in Support of Motion)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order (re: Requests for Production of Documents)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Notice ( OF COURTCALL APPEARANCE)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff Don Lee Farms' Notice of Withdrawal)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER))
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of 01/24/2020)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (GRANTING UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date; M...))
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Summons (to 3rd Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Amended Complaint (3rd)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Regarding Pltf Reply in Support of Motion For Leave to File Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/28/2020)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (proof of electronic service)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Undertaking (Under Section 489.210 C.C.P. in the amount of $10,000)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice ( OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order to unseal Discovery Referee's Rep...))
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice (of court order regarding Don Lee Farms' right to attach order and writ of attachment)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (by defendant Mark Nelson)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PURS...))
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice (OF REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/02/2020)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order re: 170.6 Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice (of continuance of hearing)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice (Consent to Electronic Service)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice (CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (for Leave to File Its Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/28/2020)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion For Leave To File Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (Of Lapidus In Support Of Opposition To Motion For Leave To File Fourth Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice (of Court call Appearance)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Unseal Discovery Referee'...))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING BEYOND MEAT, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Regarding Beyond Meat, Inc.'s First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ((1st) (1st))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Todd J. Densen In Support of Don Lee Farms' Motion)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (4th))
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Marvin S. Putnam in Support of Motion to File Records Under Seal)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Records in Support of Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Y.L. Yeung in Support of Beyond Meat Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Kelli Wilson in Support of Motion to File Records Under Seal [Redacted])
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Declaration ([Redacted] of Safia Gray Hussain in Support of Don Lee Farms' Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions ([Redacted])
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Neil G. Nandi)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Jason P. Stiehl)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Answer (TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Record Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Answer (TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Answer (TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Reply in Support of Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Reply (Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Jessica Quetsch?s Opposition to Don Lee Farms? Motion For Sanctions)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Sanctions) of 09/28/2020)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Records in Support of Beyond Meat's...))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Reply (Don Lee Farms' Reply In Support of Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to CCP Section 128.7)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE DEFENDANT-CROSS-COMPLAINANT BEYOND MEAT, INC.'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order RE: Plaintiff-Cross-Defendant Don Lee Farms' Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Jason P. Stiehl...))
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE: 9-29-2020 MINUTE ORDER)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice (of Orders Adopting Referee's Reports and Recommendations)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Beyond Meat's Motion to Seal Jessic...))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Unopposed...))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Declaration ( OF LISA E. RUBIN IN SUPPORT OF DON LEE FARMS? APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOAN MOCKENHAUPT IN SUPPORT OF DON LEE FARMS? APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF LISA E. RUBIN IN SUPPORT OF DON LEE FARMS? APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRANDON GOODMAN IN SUPPORT OF DON LEE FARMS? APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF EDWARD K. LEE IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Response to Requet for Production No. 65)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Notice ( of Hearing on MTC)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Opposition (TO BEYOND MEAT INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Opposition ( TO BEYOND MEAT, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION NO. 65)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to continue writ of attachment hearing)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW))
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Response to Request for Production No. 65)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Declaration (REDACTED Declaration of Kelli Wilson ISO Opposition to Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Opposition (REDACTED Opposition to Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of Lodging Documents Under Seal with Opposition to Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Christopher Yeung ISO Opposition to Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Gary Schultz ISO Opposition to Writ of Attachment)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice (of Opposition to Application for Right to Attach Order)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel A. Platt in support of Don Lee Farms' Motion)
Date: 2019-12-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing Date on D...))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Response (Response to DLF Evidentiary Objections)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice ( of Errata re Declarations)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re Wilson Declaration)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Opposition (to writ of attachment (unredacted))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (Of Wilson in support of opposition to writ of attachment (unredacted))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, DON LEE FARMS, FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ...))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (Of Mockenhaupt in support of opposition to writ of attachment (unredacted))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (OF BRANDON GOODMAN IN SUPPORT OF DON LEE FARMS? APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Schultz in support of opposition to writ of attachment (unredacted))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amen...))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Response (to Don Lee Farms' Separate Statement in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Objection (in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication and Reply in Support Thereof; [Proposed] Order)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Reply (in Further Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Notice (of Order on Joint Stipulation to Seal Documents)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendation)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Opposition (DON LEE FARMS OPPOSITION TO BEYOND MEATS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS RE: REFEREE'S REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATION RE: BEYOND MEAT'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendations)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION RE: PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND ORDER)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Orders Re: Joint Stipulations to Seal)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION RE: PRETRIAL DEADLINES)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendation)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Seal Documents and Testimony Lodged and Order)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER ADOPTING REFEREE?S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION)
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Motion for Order (FOR ORDER DENYING "CLAWBACK" DEMAND PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 2031.285)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of Documents Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Reply in Support of Beyond Meat, In...))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Jason P. Stiehl...))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Status Report (JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance of Marvin S. Putnam and Laura R. Washington at Status Conference)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 01/19/2021)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Exhibit List (Compendium)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/29/2021)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order Deeming Case Nos. BC662838 and 20STCV41390 Related)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Kelli Wilson in Support)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Marvin S. Putnam in Support)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Certain Exhibits)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Consolidate Related Actions)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL...))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL...))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLW FOODS, LLC?S DEMURRER TO DON LEE FARMS? COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Opposition (Don Lee Farms' Opposition to Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Separate Statement)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Motion for an Order Compelling Further Responses)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS ON STIPULATIONS TO SEAL AND NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO SEAL OFF-CALENDAR)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Remote Appearance by Gary J. Coelho, II)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Separate Statement (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT-CROSS-COMPLAINANT BEYOND MEAT, INC.?S MOTION FOR AN ORDER:)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits to the Declaration...))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice (of Rulings at March 18, 2021 Hearing)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDERS ON MOTION TO SEAL AND STIPULATION TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Status Report (JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE OF DANIEL A. PLATT AND SAFIA GRAY HUSSAIN AT STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Joint Status Report))
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Don Lee Farms' Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff-Cross-Defendant Don Lee Farms' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant-Cross-Complainant Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Request For Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/12/2021)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF REPLY)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Reply (Beyond Meat, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Reply (Defendant-Cross-Complainant Beyond Meat, Inc.?s Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Response (Defendant-Cross-Complainant Beyond Meat, Inc.?s Responses to Evidentiary Objections)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Hearing on Motion...))
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order Re May 7, 2021 Hearing on Motions for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order ([Heard by Discovery Referee])
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication ([Redacted])
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment ([Redacted])
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDERS ON JOINT STIPULATIONS TO SEAL)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Order (Re: Application to be Admitted as Counsel Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Re: Application of Emily H. Stone for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Court-Ordered Commission to the State of Texas for Issuance of a Subpoena)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Court-Ordered Commission ...))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Objections to Referee's Report...))
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice (of Orders Re: Joint Stipulations to Seal)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendations)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDERS RE: REFEREE'S REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE: BEYOND MEAT'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice (of Order Adopting Referee's Report and Recommendations)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Laura R. Washington in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Defendant-Cross-Complainant B...))
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for an Order Compelling Further Responses and/or Production of Documents)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Documents Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Documents Conditionally Under Seal)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Laura R. Washington)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Marvin S. Putnam)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Tiffany M. Ikeda [REDACTED])
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Nima H. Mohebbi [REDACTED])
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other FOR ORDER DENYING ?CLAWBACK? DEMAND...))
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff-Cross-Defendant Don Lee Farms' Reply in Support of Motion to Keep Documents Under Seal)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance at Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Entry of Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel of Record and Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Seal Documents and Testimony Lodged and [Proposed] Order)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Objection (to Discovery Referee's March 15, 2022 Report and Recommendation)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice (of Remote Appearance)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice (of Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Seal)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.