Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gamble Larry, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Kesluk Silverstein & Jacob P.C., against Wal-Mart Stores Inc., represented by Ford & Harrison, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dalila Corral Lyons presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management132 days |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2017 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions145 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time141 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: June 07, 2017DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: July 13, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: September 25, 2017OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: September 21, 2017Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 13, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.