Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pelaez Anthony, Pelaez Valerie, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Brusavich Bruce Michael, against Xxxx Xxxxx D.O., represented by Pang Darren V., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 16, 2017 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions622 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time681 days |
Proof of Service -
Date: September 04, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 08, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 28, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: December 27, 2018Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: December 27, 2018Reply - Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike
Date: January 18, 2019COMPLAINT 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE (MEDICAL MALPRACTICE); ETC
Date: May 16, 2017Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re Demurrer, Without Motion to Strike)
Date: January 28, 2019Notice - Notice Defendants Notice of Taking the Demurrer and Motion to Strike Off Calendar
Date: February 28, 2019FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE (MEDICAL MALPRACTICE); ETC.
Date: November 15, 2017Minute Order ( (Court Order re Demurrer, Without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Notice (Of Continue Trial And Final Status Conference)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Opposition (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Rescheduling Defendant xxxxx xxxx, D.O.'s Demurre...))
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 28, 2019Notice (Defendants Notice of Taking the Demurrer and Motion to Strike Off Calendar)
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Opposition (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Demurrer with Motion to Strike Filed by xxxxx ...))
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 28, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.