Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hanna Rosemary, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Myers David P. Esq., against Cvs Rx Services Inc., Pharmacy Cvs, Longs Drug Stores California Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Malcolm Mackey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management139 days |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2017 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDeemed Complete (No Remand From Federal Court) |
Case Cycle Time240 days |
Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Document:Ntc of Removal to Federal Court Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: January 16, 2018Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service -
Date: June 21, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: June 29, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; 1) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC
Date: May 10, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: October 12, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: January 16, 2018DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: June 20, 2017Request for Dismissal Filed by Rosemary Hanna (Plaintiff)
Date: July 03, 2019Answer Filed by Longs Drug Stores California, LLC (Legacy Party); CVS RX Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Rosemary Hanna (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rosemary Hanna (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rosemary Hanna (Plaintiff)
Date: January 16, 2018Substitution of Attorney Filed by CVS Pharmacy (Defendant); CVS RX Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rosemary Hanna (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rosemary Hanna (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Rosemary Hanna (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 03, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 16, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.