Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Delfin Jr. Benito E. Esq., against Hand Homecare Provider Inc., Health Alliance Nurses Corp., Nishi Emelyn E., Reguyal Joederick, represented by Morrow Iii Andrew M. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Barbara A. Meiers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara A. Meiers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management225 days |
Filing DateMay 10, 2017 |
CategoryOther Commercial/Business Tort (Not Fraud/ Breach Of Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time652 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 25, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: June 01, 2017Motion to Confirm Settlement
Date: December 20, 2018DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: July 25, 2017DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: September 28, 2017DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: September 28, 2017AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 11, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Status Conference) of 10/30/2018)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling re Setting Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling re Setting Status Conference) of 10/09/2018)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: February 21, 2019Motion to Confirm Settlement
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Jury Trial))
Date: January 07, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: January 08, 2019Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/07/2019)
Date: January 07, 2019Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Status Conference) of 02/21/2019)
Date: February 21, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 08, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.