Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Los Angeles, Lengle Yelena, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Aghakhani Arsineh, Balaban Daniel Keith, Padua Karina A. Esq., against City Of Los Angeles, County Of Los Angeles, Elzan, Express Home Builders And Design Inc., Hazan David, (total of 6) See All represented by Feuer Michael Nelson, Kwak John Jiwoong, Woodward Karen Elizabeth, Levy Esq. Efrat, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 27, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions204 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: David Hazan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Default entered as to Express Home Builders and Design, Inc. On the Complaint filed by YELENA LENGLE on
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Yelena Lengle (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Michael Elzan [Doe 1] (Defendant); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Recusal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 03, 2020Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: David Hazan (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Yelena Lengle (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT
Date: October 03, 2017Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: October 04, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE;ETC
Date: April 27, 2017AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: August 28, 2018Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED)
Date: February 19, 2020CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: October 03, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT, DAVID HAZAN
Date: December 19, 2017Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an order shortening time ...))
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial, FSC, and Related Discovery and Motion Cut-Off Dates)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To continue trial and all related dates)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC, AND MOTI...))
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Opposition (Re: Elzam's opposition to Motion to Deem Facts As Admitted By Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses to Requests For Documents By Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER OF DEFENDANT DAVID HAZAN OFF-CALENDAR)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and Related Dates)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Motion re: (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related...))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set 1)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Motion To Deem Facts Admitted By Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other To deem facts admitted))
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Declaration (Of Tiva Amiri-Davani in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/18/2020)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement))
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Recusal) of 08/03/2020)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Elzan, Michael (DOE 1) (Defendant); As to: Yelena Lengle (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Recusal))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 06/03/2020)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Not Entered)
Date: August 05, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.