Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gibson Charlotte Diane, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Billings Jeffrey Ray, Cutting Stacey Rae, Law Offices Of Larry H. Parker Inc, against Andrade Raul Vallin. Jr, Financial Services Vehicle Trust, represented by Houghton Lowell G. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen I. Goorvitch Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time931 days |
[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person -
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO ANSWER FORM INTERROGATORIES; ETC
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Motion re: - Motion re: Reopen Discovery
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: notice of settlement) of 08/21/2019)
Date: August 21, 2019Minute order entered: 2017-11-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: November 08, 2019Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Continue FSC and Trial Dates)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: August 21, 2019Receipt
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application To C...))
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte to Continue Trial and Reopen Discovery)
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement))
Date: August 21, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Motion re: (Reopen Discovery)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.