Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
1912 Broadway Lofts Inc., filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Kaneda Joseph Esq., against Broadway Lofts Llc, represented by Smylie & Leven, Tyson & Mendes Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Yvette M. Palazuelos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYvette M. Palazuelos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management163 days |
Filing DateApril 19, 2017 |
CategoryConstruction Defect (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time331 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE ON COURT'S RULING REGARDING NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION
Date: May 15, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2018BROADWAY LOFTS, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: June 06, 2017COMPLAINT FOR: 1. STRICT LIABILITY: ETC.
Date: April 19, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE RE: COURT?S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Date: August 09, 2017Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: March 23, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 16, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: September 20, 2017Association of Attorney
Date: October 10, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.