Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Burciaga Manuel, Covina Valley Unified School District, G Elizabeth, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Casselman Gary S., Casselman Gary Steven, Jung Elliott, against Burciaga Manuel, Covina Valley Unified School District, Padilla Michael, Rocha Sylvia, represented by Cheung Joseph Esq., Cheung Joseph Wing-Hang Esq., Johnson Ezedrick Samuel Iii, Mccune Dana John Esq, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Pomona Courthouse South with Dukes, Robert A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDukes, Robert A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management437 days |
Filing DateApril 14, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial1040 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HousePomona Courthouse South |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Objection to Reply to Responsive Separate Statement; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine 8; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Declaration of Danielle L. Casselman; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION NO. 23; Filed by:
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Michael Padilla (Cross-Defendant); Sylvia Rocha (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Return of Exhibits;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Document:Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Document:Reply To Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte (UNDER SEAL); Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion for Nonsuit; Exhibits; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Reply Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine 2 and 3; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Michael Padilla (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: John S. Hinman (Attorney); As to: ELIZABETH G (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Document:Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Manuel Burciaga (Defendant); Covina Valley Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Strike; Filed by: ELIZABETH G (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Document:Reply Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Response to Separate Statement; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine 10; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Michael Padilla (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael Padilla (Cross-Defendant); Sylvia Rocha (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Order [Proposed] Order granting trial continuance; Signed and Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Other - Civil Deposit Slip for Jury fees $150.00; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine 3; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/X-Defendant
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion in Limine Number 9; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Appl and Ord for Appt of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Reassignment; Filed by: ELIZABETH G (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Order Ruling on the Court's Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Other - RELEASE OF EXHIBITS AND RECEIPT; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff); As to: Manuel Burciaga (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions Proposed; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: A. G. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Danielle Casselman re Testimony of Dr Arriaga; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Order SETTING REASONABLE TIME LIMITS FOR REMAINING WITNESSES; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ELIZABETH G (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lien Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion in Limine Number 4; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine 5; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Other - Law and Motion Rulings-Dept. O; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Motion for Order Motice of Motion and Motion for Order to Reopen Disic; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Order GRANTING, IN PART, AND DENYING, IN PART, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #13; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Transfer; Filed by:
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Court7COURT
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Document:Papers and Documents on Transfer Filed by: Court7COURT
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine 1; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Other - Civil Deposit Slip Re: Jury Fees $150.00; Filed by: ELIZABETH G (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine Number 7; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Order On Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine 6; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike or Tax Costs; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Order on the Court's Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 24, 2022Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE 3
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER TO REOPEN DISIC
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE 1
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 4
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE 10
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE 6
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE 8
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE 2
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 7
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 9
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE 5
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 109
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 9
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S COMBINED MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 2 AND 3
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 7
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE 5
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 6
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO ALL DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1NE
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION IN LIMINE FOR PLAINTIFF'S NOS. 2 AND 3 AND ...)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE 2 AND 3
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (TIME ESTIMATE: 5-7 DAYS); HEARING ON MOTION IN LI...)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NOTI...)
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Order - ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, AND DENYING, IN PART, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #13
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCL...)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (TIME ESTIMATE: 5-7 DAYS); HEARING ON MOTION IN LI...)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR NONSUIT
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Complaint - (Amended)
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. VICARIOUS LIABILITY FOR NEGLIGENCE ;ETC
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NONSUIT; EXHIBITS
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC.
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT COVINA-VALLEY AGAINST FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Complaint - (Amended)
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Manuel Burciaga (Defendant); Covina Valley Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine 2; Filed by: A. G. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: ELIZABETH G (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Order Re: CACI 1302; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply To Motion
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Opposition - Opposition to Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Other - - Other - Law and Motion Rulings-Dept. O
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment -
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT;)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE AND DEM )
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Other - (Law and Motion Rulings-Dept. O)
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Other - (Civil Deposit Slip Re: Jury Fees $150.00)
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Complaint ((2nd))
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (AND PROTECTIVE ORDER )
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Other - (Civil Deposit Slip for Jury fees $150.00)
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice (Re: Reassignment)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial, FSC and Trial Related Dates)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Separate Statement (BY Defendants/X-Comp. Covina-Valley USD in Support of MSJ)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Response (to Separate Statement)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Danielle L. Casselman)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter;))
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Objection (to Reply to Responsive Separate Statement)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment;))
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Order (Ruling on the Court's Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order;) of 07/19/2019)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order;))
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Notice (of Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice (of Completion of Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to continue trial and related dates)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related...))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order granting trial continuance)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order;) of 03/20/2020)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order;))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Motion for Order (Motice of Motion and Motion for Order to Reopen Disic)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Order (On Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Deposition of Witness;))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 9 from Introducing former counsel's deposition notes)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Number 10 to Exclude evidence not produced in discovery)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine 10)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion in Limine Number 9)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Motion re: (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JURY VIEWING OF TWO LOCATIONS RELEVANT TO THE CASE)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion in Limine Number 4)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine 8)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine 2)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine 6)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine 3)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine Number 7)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine 1)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition (Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine 5)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition By Defendants To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 1)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition By Defendants To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 4)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition By Defendants To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 10)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition By Defendants To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 9)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition By Defendants To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 5)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition By Defendants To Plaintiff's Combined Motions In Limine Nos. 2 And 3)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition By Defendants To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 6)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition By Defendants To Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 7)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice (Notice To Appear At Trial In Lieu Of A Subpoena Ccp 1987)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant CVUSD proposed Special Jury Instructions)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion in Limine Number 7)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice (Notice to Appear at Trial)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion in Limine Number 9)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion in Limine Number 6)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion in Limine Number 109)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine 5)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to All Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1ne)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine 2 and 3)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference;))
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice (Amended Notice to Attend Trial)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice (DESIGNATION OF THE TRANSCRIPT OF THE DEPOSITION OF DAFNE ESCOBEDO TAKEN ON JANUARY 26, 2018)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice (DESIGNATION OF THE TRANSCRIPT OF THE DEPOSITION OF CHRISTOPHER NEVICO, TAKEN ON JANUARY 4, 2018)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice (DESIGNATION OF THE TRANSCRIPT OF THE DEPOSITION OF RODNEY MACIAS, TAKEN ON JANUARY 5, 2018)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice (DESIGNATION OF THE TRANSCRIPT OF THE DEPOSITION OF LYNNA LAM, TAKEN ON JANUARY 26, 2018)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice (DESIGNATION OF THE TRANSCRIPT OF THE DEPOSITION OF ISABELLA BRUZZONE TAKEN ON JANUARY 4, 2018)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion in Limine Defendant's Motion in Limine Noti...))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (OF LODGING ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS FOR TRIAL SET ON OCTOBER 4, 2021)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (time estimate: 5-7 days)))
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Request (Revised Page and Line Designation of deposition transcript of Sarah Loe)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Order (GRANTING, IN PART, AND DENYING, IN PART, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #13)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (time estimate: 5-7 days);))
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 10/06/2021)
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress;))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress;))
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress;))
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress;))
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Order (SETTING REASONABLE TIME LIMITS FOR REMAINING WITNESSES)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress;))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress;))
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Brief (DEFENDANTS' BRIEF RE CACI 1302 AND RAPE TRAUMA SYNDROME; DECLARATION OF JOSEPH CHEUNG; EXHIBITS)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Jury Trial Based ...))
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Re: Jury Instructions;))
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Proposed)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress;))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Re: Jury Instructions;))
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO CVUSD DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PROPOSED SPECIAL INSTRUCTION 1)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress;))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress;))
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Danielle Casselman re Testimony of Dr Arriaga)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Judgment on Special Verdict
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress;))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Return of Exhibits;))
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress;))
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion for Nonsuit; Exhibits)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Return of Exhibits;) of 11/24/2021)
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Motion re: (FOR NONSUIT)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Other - (RELEASE OF EXHIBITS AND RECEIPT)
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress;))
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Order (Re: CACI 1302)
Date: 2021-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress))
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial In Progress))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Strike or Tax Costs)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Cross-Complaint))
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings (Appl and Ord for Appt of Guardian Ad Litem)
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE FAC )
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEM TO FAC )
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Reply To Motion (TO DEM )
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Declaration (IN RESPONSE TO NON-OPP TO MOTION TO STRIKE FAC )
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Notice (OF NON-OPP TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FAC )
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Papers and Documents on Transfer
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice (DESIGNATION OF THE TRANSCRIPT OF THE DEPOSITION OF AMANDA DEEN TAKEN ON JANUARY 4, 2018)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion in Limine For Plaintiff's Nos. 2 and 3 and ...))
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (time estimate: 5-7 days); Hearing on Ex Parte App...))
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Page Line Designation of Former Testimony of Sarah Loe)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Page and Line Designations of former testimony of Sarah Loe, Frederick Allen)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Lodging Deposition Transcripts)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Notice of Motion and Motion to Excl...))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (time estimate: 5-7 days); Hearing on Motion in Li...))
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (time estimate: 5-7 days); Hearing on Motion in Li...))
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.