Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Knox Services Llc, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Mayers John A. Esq., Scheer Law Group Llp, against Cp Law Group, represented by Kennick Michael T. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael J. Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 11, 2017 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time143 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Date: June 27, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 26, 2017COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ACCOUNT STATED ;ETC
Date: April 11, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 17, 2017Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: August 08, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: September 01, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.