Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Thomas Scott, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ambarchyan Romel Esq., against Bayview Loan Servicing Llc Msj-Granted, Cenlar Agency Incorporation, Cenlar Fsb, Mtc Financial Incorporation, Trustee Corps, (total of 5) See All represented by Gardner Jeffrey B. Esq., Malcolm & Cisneros, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management118 days |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2017 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions304 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time353 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 20, 2017DECLARATION OF BRIAN S. THOMLEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 29, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: June 05, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: April 13, 2017SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ETC
Date: November 17, 2017SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 29, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 29, 2017PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES; ETC.
Date: June 14, 2018STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO OPPOSE CENLAR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 21, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: May 25, 2017DECLARATION OF DIANE CONSTANTINE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 29, 2017VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR' 1. CIVIL CODE SECTION 2923.7; ETC
Date: June 30, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 29, 2017ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS? FEES
Date: June 28, 2018DEFENDANT BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 17, 2017FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS
Date: June 30, 2017STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: May 30, 2017AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: July 19, 2017Amendment to Complaint Filed by Scott Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Scott Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Scott Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: August 07, 2018Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Cenlar Agency, incorporation (Defendant)
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Scott Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by FSB Cenlar (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed by FSB Cenlar (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by FSB Cenlar (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by FSB Cenlar (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by FSB Cenlar (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Cenlar Agency, incorporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC (MSJ-GRANTED) (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Scott Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC (MSJ-GRANTED) (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Clerk
Date: October 26, 2018Notice Filed by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC (MSJ-GRANTED) (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Scott Thomas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: October 26, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-06-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: January 31, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.