Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Romero Elida, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Lee Henry M. Esq., against J. Kenrich Inc, Tbetty Inc, represented by Kim Haewon Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeresa A. Beaudet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management132 days |
Filing DateMarch 21, 2017 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time119 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT
Date: April 19, 2017Summons
Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 19, 2017Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: May 08, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 18, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 19, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.