Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Reese Robert, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Yun Edward Esq., against Elwood Staffing Services Inc, Space Exploration Technologies Corp., represented by Hernaez Alexander, Tochner Stuart D. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard E. Rico presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard E. Rico Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2016 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time927 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 12, 2017Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: November 16, 2018Minute order entered: 2017-12-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-11 00:00:00
Date: April 11, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-01-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 01, 2019Minute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference))
Date: August 19, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.