Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ayala Sandra, Sierra Martha, filed a(n) Negligent Breach - Commercial case represented by Castelblanco Law Group Aplc, against Group V San Bernardino Inc, Group Xii Properties Lp, Pama Management Inc, represented by Bremer Keith G. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management132 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeNegligent Breach |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time538 days |
Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Mtn for Summary Adjud of Issues Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Sandra Ayala (Plaintiff); Martha Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Document:Petition-Hearing Minor's Compromise Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Document:Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Brief-Reply Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Document:Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Document:Brief-Reply Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Summons Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Document:Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: August 22, 2018Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Order Filed by Sandra Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Order Filed by Martha Sierra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Sandra Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Sandra Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Summons Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Brief-Reply
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account
Date: February 13, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-08-22 00:00:00
Date: August 22, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.