Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Infusio Life Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Stephen Kernan Law Offices Of, against Haven Tara, represented by Gill Jasmin K., Turk Hussain, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management77 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions859 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time859 days |
Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Document:Proof-Personal Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration of Jasmin K. Gill in support of Reply; Filed by: Tara Haven (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Tara Haven (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Declaration Of Jasmin K. Gill; Filed by: Tara Haven (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Order re Motions to Compel; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Order re Continue Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for an Order; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Declaration of Maurice D. Pessah in support of Reply; Filed by: Tara Haven (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Declaration Of Maurice D.Pessah; Filed by: Tara Haven (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion for a Protective Order; Filed by: Tara Haven (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Tara Haven (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Document:Ord-App/Waiver Court Fees & Costs Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-05-01T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion for an Order; Filed by: Attorney
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Motion for Order to Compel; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Order re Protective Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Tara Haven (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Non-Opposition to Motions to Compel; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time on Motions to Compel; Filed by:
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Tara Haven (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Declaration of S. Michael Kernan in Support of Motion; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Tara Haven (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Tara Haven (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Infusio Life, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Proof-Personal Service
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-08 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Motion for Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Motion for Order (to Compel)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Order (re Continue Trial)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Notice (of ruling on informal discovery conference)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Order to Continue Trial))
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Declaration (Of Maurice D.Pessah)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application re Verizon Phone Records)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for: 1) Order Granting that ...))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Objection (to Untimely Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Discovery)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Order (re Motions to Compel)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Declaration (Of Jasmin K. Gill)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order; Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Maurice D. Pessah in support of Reply)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for a Protective Order)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Jasmin K. Gill in support of Reply)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Protective Order Limiting Discovery and...))
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Order (re Protective Order)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Motion for Sanctions, including Terminating Sanctions)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Terminating Sanctions))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ...))
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Declaration (of S. Michael Kernan in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to RFA's)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of 03/06/2019)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ...))
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Daniel Beyer in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Declaration (of S. Michael Kernan in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Judgment (] Judgment)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Motions to Compel)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial & Related D...))
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Declaration (of S. Michael Kernan in Support of Motion)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Objection (to the Declaration of Hussain Turk in Support of Defendant's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial & Related Dates; Declaration of Hussain Turk; [Proposed] Order)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.