Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barrett Joseph filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case against Doyle Conal, Doyle Law A California Professional Law, Pesin Philip S., Wilshire Law Firm Plc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth Allen White presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2017 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time126 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 17, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 16, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 14, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND DAMAGES 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC
Date: February 23, 2017Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: March 13, 2017Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Summons Filed by Doyle Law, a California Professional Law (Legacy Party); Conal Doyle (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Complaint Filed by null PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.