Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Koshkaryan Silva, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Levin Ellen, Martinian Tigran, against Doe Manager Doe 1, Ross Stores Inc, represented by Saacke Charles Frederic, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2017 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions713 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
VerdictDefendant |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - After Jury Trial |
Case Cycle Time713 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: March 08, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED SET ONE OFF CALENDAR
Date: May 24, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 26, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES ETC.
Date: March 08, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE; ETC
Date: March 08, 2018ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]
Date: February 15, 2018ANSWER OF ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC. TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. PRE1VILSES LIABILITY 2. NEGLIGENCE
Date: February 15, 2017Receipt
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: December 11, 2018Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: January 29, 2019Notice
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 01/29/2019)
Date: January 29, 2019Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: January 15, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-06-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: January 29, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.