Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Rivas Salvador, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brooks William Post, against All Yellow Taxi Inc, Global Paratransit Inc, Jaimes Alberto, Lopez Victor, represented by Knapp Petersen & Clarke Law Offices Of, Tropp-Thompson Deborah S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions447 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time911 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00ANSWER BY DEFENDANTS ALL YELLOW TAXI, INC. AND GLOBAL PARATRANSIT, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 15, 2019Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: May 13, 2019Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case))
Date: May 13, 2019Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and Related Dates)
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: August 19, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.