Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Benhamo Eliyahu, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nehoray Mac E. Esq., against Lahooti Mohammad, represented by Deenihan Matthew J. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time618 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: April 20, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES -PERSONAL INJURY; ETC
Date: February 15, 2017Answer
Date: April 25, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Receipt
Date: January 10, 2018Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 26, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.