Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Glendale Plumbing & Fire Supply Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Macdonald Kirk S. Esq., against American Contractors Indemnity Company, Radix Fire Protection Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2017 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time69 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: March 08, 2017COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC
Date: February 15, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 10, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 13, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 10, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 13, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: April 25, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.