Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
National Funding Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Salisian Neal S. Esq., against Liberty Enterprises Specialty Contractor, Mcdurmon Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Terry Green presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2017 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions51 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time146 days |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: July 11, 2017Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: July 11, 2017Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: November 20, 2017Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Document:OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: March 22, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 07, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 11, 2017Judgment
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: November 20, 2017Declaration
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Request
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.