Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
122 East Washington Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Trenk Joseph Esq., against Clinica Medica San Miguel, Mahfouz Michael M.D., represented by Garner Craig B., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management114 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2017 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Commercial (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions92 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time324 days |
NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: February 27, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY CLINICAL MEDICA SAN MIGUEL AND MAHFOUZ MICHAEL, MD
Date: May 15, 2017COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER -
Date: February 15, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE - UNLAWFUL DETAINER
Date: March 01, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: June 22, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.