Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hayes Evelyn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lieber Mark C. Esq., against Jordan Edgar, represented by Pegan Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time350 days |
Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: January 31, 2018Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: September 08, 2017Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 18, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: NEGLIGENCE
Date: February 15, 2017ANSWER OF EDGAR JORDAN TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: January 31, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.