Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Alsaleh Project Management Inc, El Monte City School District, G&Y General Contractors Inc, Royal Construction Corp., The Nazerian Group, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Lucas Spencer Ross, Ravipudi Rahul L., against Alsaleh Project Management Inc, El Monte City School District, G & Y General Contractors Inc., G&Y General Contractors Inc., Royal Construction Corp., (total of 7) See All represented by Faenza Christopher Edward Esq., Fox Dana Alden, Luetto Helen Marie, Oberrecht Kimberly Suzanne, Pape Kara Ann, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with David J. Cowan presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management679 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1100 days |
Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Association of Attorney; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Summons on Cross-Complaint; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of cmc; Filed by: The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Motion to Sever; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by:
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice Motion in Limine 2 of 2; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: The Nazerian Group (Cross-Complainant); The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice Motion in Limine 1 of 2; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: G & Y GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No.7; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's motion in limine no. 8; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Opposition Opposition To Motion; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Leave; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Order Court's Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Court's Ruling filed ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Helen Marie Luetto (Attorney)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER RE JURY TRIAL; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Response to Motion for trial preference; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Response to APM's Separate Statement of Facts; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: G & Y GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Opposition to APM's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant); As to: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Order Court's Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Response Response To Separate Statement; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate; Filed by: The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling (adv from ); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Opposition BC649021; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Notice Notice of Lodgment; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Augment Expert Designation; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by:
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR BRUCE GALE PH.D. Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 1; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Undertaking Bond; Filed by:
Date: 2023-03-30T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Document:Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Order Court's Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Declaration Declaration in Response to OSC; Filed by: Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 22, 2023Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Lee Ann Hitchman (Non-Party)
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 03, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: April 17, 2017Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 08, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 16, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: May 11, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 14, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 25, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 05, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 17, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 05, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 21, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 03, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 16, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 12, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 11, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 04, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 29, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 11, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 24, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 05, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 03, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 01, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 25, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 19, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 24, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 24, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 29, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 28, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: August 16, 2019Motion for Trial Preference
Date: October 04, 2019Response - RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE
Date: October 17, 2019Response - RESPONSE ROYAL CONSTRUCTION CORPS RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE
Date: October 24, 2019Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 25, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE)
Date: October 30, 2019Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE
Date: October 30, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 08, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO APMS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: December 23, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO APM'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 27, 2019Reply - REPLY DEF REPLY TO EL MONTE SCHOOL'S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 05, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 08, 2020Motion to Bifurcate
Date: January 15, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: January 10, 2020Motion to Sever
Date: January 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: January 22, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIALS
Date: January 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: January 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE MOTION IN LIMINE 2 OF 2
Date: February 05, 2020Notice - NOTICE MOTION IN LIMINE 1 OF 2
Date: February 05, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE; HEAR...)
Date: February 10, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.7
Date: February 14, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: March 02, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: March 03, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMININE NO. 7
Date: March 03, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: March 03, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: March 03, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: March 03, 2020Reply - REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EL MONTE CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION
Date: September 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE NAZERIAN GROUP'S EXPERT DESIGNATION
Date: December 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT THE NAZARIAN GROUP'S N...)
Date: December 18, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: January 27, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 02, 2021Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AUGMENT EXPERT DESIGNATION
Date: February 03, 2021Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE ITS EXPERT DESIGNATION
Date: February 05, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: November 12, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: June 23, 2021COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC
Date: February 02, 2017ROYAL CONSTRUCTION CORP.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: September 12, 2018Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: June 23, 2021ALSALEH PROJECT MANAGEMENT, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSSCOMPLAINT OF ROYAL CONSTRUCTION CORP.
Date: October 02, 2018Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: October 02, 2018CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ALSALEH PROJECT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Date: October 02, 2018Cross-Complaint
Date: October 02, 2018Cross-Complaint
Date: April 22, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: December 07, 2018Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint
Date: October 19, 2018Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 30, 2018Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint
Date: December 07, 2018Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 03, 2019Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: May 14, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: December 16, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: November 27, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 24, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE
Date: February 10, 2021Answer Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Association of Attorney Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Answer Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by The Nazerian Group (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Order (Court's Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice (Motion in Limine 1 of 2) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint) Filed by El Monte City School District (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Motion to Sever Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Answer Filed by The Nazerian Group (Cross-Complainant); The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice (Motion in Limine 2 of 2) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Witness List Filed by G & Y GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Answer Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Jury Trial) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's motion in limine no. 8) Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by The Nazerian Group (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Answer Filed by The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Lodgment) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to Augment Expert Designation) Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Opposition (to APM's Motion for Summary Judgment) Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Witness List Filed by G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by G & Y GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate Filed by The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Joinder Filed by The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Joinder Filed by The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Court's Ruling filed ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Order (Proposed) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 1) Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Joinder Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Joinder Filed by The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Defendant The Nazarian Group's N...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order striking the def...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Witness List Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER RE JURY TRIAL) Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Mandatory Settlement Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING CONTINUANCE) Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Status Conference Re Long Cause Trial Determination)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by The Nazerian Group (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Joinder Filed by The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Minor's Compromise)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Royal Construction Corp.s Separat...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff); Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application .)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by The Nazerian Group (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Clarification of the Cour...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Helen Marie Luetto (Attorney)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Summons Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (of cmc) Filed by The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by The Nazerian Group (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Specia...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial / Long Cause Trial Determination)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING-DECEDENT'S ESTATE OR TRUST) Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 2) Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Specia...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING?DECEDENT'S ESTATE OR TRUST) Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition To Motion) Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER CONSOLIDATING HE...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR BRUCE GALE PH.D.) Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by The Nazerian Group (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Submission of Bond and Filing of Case...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Order (Court's Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case reassignment) Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 2) Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings Application of Plaintiff to Continue Tri...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Witness List Filed by The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Order (Court's Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Minor's Compromise)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Response (Response To Separate Statement) Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of continuance of trial) Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Summons Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Leave) Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 2) Filed by The Nazerian Group, Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No.7) Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Kimberly Suzanne Oberrecht (Attorney)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Augment Record Experts; Hearing on Motio...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED LIST OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS) Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Answer Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling (adv from )) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by G & Y GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Response (to Motion for trial preference) Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Royal Construction Corp. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by G&Y General Contractors, Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Response (to APM's Separate Statement of Facts) Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alsaleh Project Management,Inc (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER STRIKING DEFENDA...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by El Monte City School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition Hearing on Minor's Comp Petition)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Opposition (BC649021) Filed by Guadalupe M. Lopez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings Application of Plaintiff to Continue Tri...))
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Plaintiff's Ex parte to Cont. trial and related dates)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 1=The Nazerian Group)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (of cmc)
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case reassignment)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Roe 2)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Minute Order re Case Management Conference on July 17, 2019)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Response (to Motion for trial preference)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Alsaleh Project Managements Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 2)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Lodgment)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Trial Preference)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling (adv from ))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Response (Royal Construction Corps Response Plaintiffs Motion for Trial Preference)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO ROYAL CONSTRUCTION CORP.?S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Response (to APM's Separate Statement of Facts)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Opposition (to APM's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Reply (Def Reply to El Monte School's Opposition to its Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Opposition to APMs Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Roe 3 El Monte City School District)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Order (Court's Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Response (Response To Separate Statement)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition To Motion For Separate Trials)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Motion to Sever
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (The Nazerian Group's Motion to Bifurcate)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice (Motion in Limine 2 of 2)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate; Hear...))
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Minute Order re Trial Setting Conference on May 28, 2020)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF SPENCER R. LUCAS IN SUPPORT OF ADA ACCOMMODATION REQUEST)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Royal Construction Corp.s Separat...))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3 - to preclude evidence of well-intentioned or accepted responsibility)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Jury Trial) of )
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Helen Luetto in support of The Nazerian Group's Motion In Limine No. 4)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Reply (to the Opposition to Defendant El Monte City School District Motion for Clarification)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Helen Luetto in support of The Nazerian Group's Opposition to Pl.'s Ex Parte ())
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order striking the def...))
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Motion re: (Motion re: (Clarification on Discovery Cut-Off))
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Clarification of the Cour...))
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL 4 - to exclude the opinions of Pl.'s expert Grandinette and video)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF KRISTINN OLAFSSON AT TIME OF TRIAL)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's reply to the opposition of the The Nazerian Group)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike The Nazerian Group's Expert Designation)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Defendant The Nazarian Group's N...))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Opposition (to El Monte City School District's Motion In Limine No. 2 to Exclude Expert Brian Jones)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Elise M. Czelusniak in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Request for Special Jury Instructions)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Opposition (BC649021)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)])
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Defendant Alsaleh Project Management, Inc.'s Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF KRISTINN OLAFSSON AT TIME OF TRIAL)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice (Notice of continuance of trial)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING CONTINUANCE)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to Augment Expert Designation)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER STRIKING DEFENDA...))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Leave)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike its Expert Designation)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Martin S. McMahan in Opposition to Plaintiff Lopez's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice (OF ALSALEH PROJECT MANAGEMENT, INC.?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS INFORMATION)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Martin S. McMahan in Opposition to Plaintiff Lopez's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Order (Proposed)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Order (Court's Ruling)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order re Royal Construction Corp's Motion for Leave to Augment Expert Designation)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Court's Ruling filed )
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's objections to defendant El Monte City School District's Deposition Designation)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Mandatory Settlement Conference))
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice (Defendant El Monte City School Districts Designation of the Deposition of Erica Lopez at Trial)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR PERRY LUBENS, M.D.)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Objection (to El Monte City School District's Notice of Intent to Use Video of Depositions at Trial)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR BRUCE GALE PH.D.)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Specia...))
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial / Long Cause Trial Determination))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Objection (APM Objection to El Monte's Notice to Appear)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Use Video of Depositions at Trial)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER RE JURY TRIAL)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Objection (Defendant Alsaleh Objections to amd Counter-Designations of Def El Monte)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Objection (To Designation and Notice of Intent to Play Video Deposition of Juan Munoz at Trial)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Status Conference Re Long Cause Trial Determination))
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition Hearing on Minor's Comp Petition))
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...))
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition (NOTICE OF HEARING-DECEDENT'S ESTATE OR TRUST)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING-DECEDENT'S ESTATE OR TRUST)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Order (ORDER to Reconsider the Court's December 14, 2021 Order Approving Minor's Compromise)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application .))
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Notice of lodgment pursuant to los angeles county local rule)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Specia...))
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Submission of Bond and Filing of Case...))
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (PURSUANT TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY LOCAL RULE 4.115(C))
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Notice (Motion in Limine 1 of 2)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED LIST OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No.7)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's motion in limine no. 8)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 18, 2020)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Liminine No. 7)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Opposition (Oppostion of the Nazerian Group to plaintiff's motion in limine number 7)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Opposition (Alsaleh Opposition to El Monte MIL No. 3 to Include Expert Opinion of Dr. Marian Stephens)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Motion for Leave (TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition To Motion)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Opposition (Alsaleh Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application to Strike its Expert Designation)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER CONSOLIDATING HE...))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Augment Record Experts; Hearing on Motio...))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Augment Record Experts; Hearing on Motio...) of )
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff Guadalupe Lopez's notice of intent to play video deposition)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE ON FEBRUARY 18, 2020)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's motion in limine no. 8)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Liminine No. 7)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Opposition (Oppostion of the Nazerian Group to plaintiff's motion in limine number 7)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/23/2020)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Minute Order re Trial Setting Conference on May 28, 2020)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/17/2020)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Royal Construction Corp.s Separat...))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/20/2020)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF SPENCER R. LUCAS IN SUPPORT OF ADA ACCOMMODATION REQUEST)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Jury Trial) of 08/12/2020)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Motion re: (Motion re: (Clarification on Discovery Cut-Off))
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Clarification of the Cour...))
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Reply (to the Opposition to Defendant El Monte City School District Motion for Clarification)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/23/2020)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL 4 - to exclude the opinions of Pl.'s expert Grandinette and video)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Helen Luetto in support of The Nazerian Group's Motion In Limine No. 4)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3 - to preclude evidence of well-intentioned or accepted responsibility)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order striking the def...))
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Helen Luetto in support of The Nazerian Group's Opposition to Pl.'s Ex Parte (12/4/20))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike The Nazerian Group's Expert Designation)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF KRISTINN OLAFSSON AT TIME OF TRIAL)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's reply to the opposition of the The Nazerian Group)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Opposition (to El Monte City School District's Motion In Limine No. 2 to Exclude Expert Brian Jones)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Opposition (BC649021)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Defendant The Nazarian Group's N...))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)])
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Elise M. Czelusniak in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Defendant Alsaleh Project Management, Inc.'s Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Request for Special Jury Instructions)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF KRISTINN OLAFSSON AT TIME OF TRIAL)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice (Notice of continuance of trial)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (Alsaleh Opposition to El Monte MIL No. 3 to Include Expert Opinion of Dr. Marian Stephens)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Opposition (Alsaleh Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application to Strike its Expert Designation)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Martin S. McMahan in Opposition to Plaintiff Lopez's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Martin S. McMahan in Opposition to Plaintiff Lopez's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING CONTINUANCE)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER STRIKING DEFENDA...))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition To Motion)
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Mandatory Settlement Conference))
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff Guadalupe Lopez's notice of intent to play video deposition)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice (Defendant El Monte City School Districts Designation of the Deposition of Erica Lopez at Trial)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Use Video of Depositions at Trial)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Objection (to El Monte City School District's Notice of Intent to Use Video of Depositions at Trial)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Objection (To Designation and Notice of Intent to Play Video Deposition of Juan Munoz at Trial)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's objections to defendant El Monte City School District's Deposition Designation)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Objection (Defendant Alsaleh Objections to amd Counter-Designations of Def El Monte)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER RE JURY TRIAL)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Objection (APM Objection to El Monte's Notice to Appear)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial / Long Cause Trial Determination))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR BRUCE GALE PH.D.)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR PERRY LUBENS, M.D.)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Status Conference Re Long Cause Trial Determination))
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Specia...))
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Specia...))
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING-DECEDENT'S ESTATE OR TRUST)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/23/2021)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/14/2021)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...))
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Submission of Bond and Filing of Case...))
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Plaintiff's Ex parte to Cont. trial and related dates)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings Application of Plaintiff to Continue Tri...))
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (of cmc)
Date: 2018-12-26T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case reassignment)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 1=The Nazerian Group)
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Roe 2)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Doe 2)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Minute Order re Case Management Conference on July 17, 2019)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Lodgment)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Response (to Motion for trial preference)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Alsaleh Project Managements Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Response (Royal Construction Corps Response Plaintiffs Motion for Trial Preference)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO ROYAL CONSTRUCTION CORP.?S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Trial Preference)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling (adv from 11/1/19))
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Opposition to APMs Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Response (to APM's Separate Statement of Facts)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Opposition (to APM's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Reply (Def Reply to El Monte School's Opposition to its Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Roe 3 El Monte City School District)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Order (Court's Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Response (Response To Separate Statement)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) (The Nazerian Group's Motion to Bifurcate)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition To Motion For Separate Trials)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/31/2020)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice (Motion in Limine 1 of 2)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice (Motion in Limine 2 of 2)
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED LIST OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate; Hear...))
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No.7)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to Augment Expert Designation)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Motion for Leave (TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice (OF ALSALEH PROJECT MANAGEMENT, INC.?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS INFORMATION)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike its Expert Designation)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Leave)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER CONSOLIDATING HE...))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Augment Record Experts; Hearing on Motio...))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Order (Court's Ruling)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 04/08/2021, Court's Ruling filed 4/8/21)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order re Royal Construction Corp's Motion for Leave to Augment Expert Designation)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Order (Proposed)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.