Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chow Lindsey, Chow Susan Chan, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Barrios Lydia, Batra Narinder, California Hospital Medical Center, Cannon Teresa, Chow William, (total of 15) See All represented by Maizel Samuel R., Mckenna Robert L. Iii, Ozeran David J., Tomlinson Janee, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Monica Bachner presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management702 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions140 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1270 days |
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00LINDSEY CHOW'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00MOTION FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ABATE
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00DECLARATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00PLAINTIFFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00SUSAN CHAN CHOW'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00LINDSEY CHOW'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ABATE (I.E. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) CAL. CIV. CODE 430.40
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00PLAINTIFFFS OPPOSITION AND OBJECTION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL FOR SUSAN CHAN CHOW AND LINDSEY CHOW
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00SUSAN CHAN CHOW'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00SUSAN CHAN CHOW'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00PLAINTIFFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TAO NGUYEN'S MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00LINDSEY CHOW'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEMURRER
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT TAO NGUYEN, M.D.'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00)PPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00DEFENDANT TAO NGUYEN, M.D.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ADD PUNITIVE DAMAGES
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00RULING: PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES IS DENIED.
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE SUBMITTED WITH THEIR MOTION TO AMEND
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00PLAINTIFFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00PLAINTIFFFS ANSWER & REPLY TO OPPOSITION (FILED BY MCKENNA COSTA) TO OUR MOTION TO AMEND, ETC
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00PLAINTIFFFS ANSWER & REPLY TO OPPOSITION (FILED BY LA FOLLETTE) TO OUR MOTION TO AMEND, ETC
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COM PLAINT
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT TAO NGUYEN, M.D.'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Minute Order - Minute Order (MOTION OF DEFENDANT, TAO NGUYEN, M.D., TO LIFT STAY)
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00PLAINTIFFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Reply - Reply in Support of Motion to Lift Stay as to Tao Nguyen, MD
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Order - Ruling on Motion to Lift Stay
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Motion re: - Motion re: And Motion To Lift Stay As To Defendant Tao Nguyen M.D.
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Opposition - Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Tao Nguyen's motion to Lift Stay for Himself
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL DEATH; ETC
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL DEATH; ETC.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00EXHIBIT A TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00DEFENDANT TAO NGUYEN, M.D.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00DEFENDANT TAO NGUYEN, M.D.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER ANI) DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00DEFENDANT TAO NGUYEN, M.D.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00EXHIBIT A TO DEMURRER TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Answer - ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00DEFENDANT TAO NGUYEN, M.D.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00ADDENDUM TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, LINDSEY CHOW, TO SUBSTITUTE LINDSEY CHOW...)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00RULING RE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF DEFENDANT, ST. VINCENT MEDICAL CENTER, FOR SUMMARY ...)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL DEATH; ETC
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00RULING RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Updated -- Judgment: Filed By: Tao Nguyen (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Document:Notice-Stay Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Ruling on Motion to Lift Stay; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) N.O.A "R"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Lindsey Chow (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:Exhibit Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: -R B307432; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint Filed by Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Declaration of Janee M. Tomlinson; Filed by: Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff); Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Notice Filed by California Hospital Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by:
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;B307432, NA & ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 29, 2022Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff); Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Ruling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-01-21T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Document:1N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Document:Motion for Leave Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike; Filed by: Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Demurrer to the Fourth Amended Complaint; Filed by: Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-01-21T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion to Lift Stay as to Tao Nguyen, MD; Filed by: Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Summons Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Complaint ( (3rd)) Filed by Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff); Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Verity Health System of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants St. Vincent Medical Center, Verity Heal...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((MOTION OF DEFENDANT, TAO NGUYEN, M.D., TO LIFT STAY)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Lift Stay as to Tao Nguyen, MD) Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: October 17, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Motion to Lift Stay Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, LINDSEY CHOW, TO SUBSTITUTE LINDSEY CHOW...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Janee M. Tomlinson) Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Judgment (of Dismissal with Prejudice) Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING BANKRUPTCY)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant); Lopez, Fernando, RCP(doe 3) (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Demurrer to the Fourth Amended Complaint Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00PLAINTIFFFS ANSWER & REPLY TO OPPOSITION (FILED BY MCKENNA COSTA) TO OUR MOTION TO AMEND, ETC
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Motion for Leave Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Notice Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Third Amended Complaint Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B307432, NA & ;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal NOA ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Report of Action Taken on Remittitur; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- "R"; Filed by: Lindsey Chow (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Verity Health System of California (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 9 Volumes Certified NOA B307432; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "R"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Declaration Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B307432); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Complaint ( (4th)) Filed by Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff); Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Notice Exhibitsl In Support; Filed by: St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by:
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: COVID-19 continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00PLAINTIFFFS ANSWER & REPLY TO OPPOSITION (FILED BY LA FOLLETTE) TO OUR MOTION TO AMEND, ETC
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-31 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition to motion for summary judgment; Filed by: Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Reply to Motion Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Andrew Wachtel, M.D. in Support) Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: September 29, 2022Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- ("R") Filed by Lindsey Chow (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- (RESPONDENT) Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Respondent)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff); Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Notice Filed by Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Answer (to 4th Amended Complaint) Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING BANKRUPTCY AS TO ST. VINCENT MEDI...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Report of Action Taken on Remittitur Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Lindsey Chow (Appellant)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Ruling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:001N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2017-07-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Ruling on Motion to Lift Stay Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Ruling Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Reply (to opposition) Filed by Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff); Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Tao Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Mariana Juarez (Defendant); Ma Leyba (Defendant); Fernando Lopez (Defendant) et al.
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (NOA ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Default Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Opposition (to motion for summary judgment) Filed by Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (N.O.A "R") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: -R B307432) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: September 29, 2022Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL Filed by Clerk
Date: October 17, 2022Minute Order ( (Court Order re: COVID-19 continuance)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("R") Filed by Lindsey Chow (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Default ("R") Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed ((B307432)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal as to Nominal Defenda...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Lindsey Chow (Appellant)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- (RESPONDENT "R") Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Respondent)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice (Exhibitsl In Support) Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Reply to opposition; Filed by: Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff); Susan Chan Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: COVID-19 continuance) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 9 Volumes Certified NOA B307432 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order Filed by Lindsey Chow (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Defendant, St. Vincent Medical Center, for Summary ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Declaration of Andrew Wachtel, M.D. in Support; Filed by: St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice Filed by St. Vincent Medical Center (Defendant)
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Complaint ( (4th))
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Demurrer to the Fourth Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-04 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order and Status Conference)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING BANKRUPTCY))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Motion to Lift Stay
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Janee M. Tomlinson)
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD ...))
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant Tao Nguyen's motion to Lift Stay for Himself
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Lift Stay as to Tao Nguyen, MD)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Lift Stay as to Tao Nguyen, MD)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Ruling on Motion to Lift Stay
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((MOTION OF DEFENDANT, TAO NGUYEN, M.D., TO LIFT STAY))
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Notice ( of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal of Action as to Tao Nguyen, M.D.)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Judgment (of Dismissal with Prejudice)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING BANKRUPTCY AS TO ST. VINCENT MEDI...))
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER))
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing of Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Reply (to opposition)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, LINDSEY CHOW, TO SUBSTITUTE LINDSEY CHOW...))
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Plaintiff Lindsey's Notice Writ of Mandamus
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00ONLY PLAINTIFF LINDSEY CHOW'S NOTICE OF DENIAL OF WRIT OF MANDAMUS; EXHIBIT
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants St. Vincent Medical Center, Verity Heal...))
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Answer (to 4th Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice (Demand that Defense of Statute of Limitations be Tried Separately)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice (Exhibitsl In Support)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Andrew Wachtel, M.D. in Support)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Objection (to plaintiffs evidence)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Opposition (to motion for summary judgment)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Reply (to separate statement)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: COVID-19 continuance))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Reply (to opposition to MSJ)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: COVID-19 continuance) of 04/15/2020)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Defendant, St. Vincent Medical Center, for Summary ...))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal as to Nominal Defenda...))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/20/2020)
Date: 2020-07-20T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("R")
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (N.O.A 9/17/20 "R")
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (RESPONDENT)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.