Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Aguilar Dulce, Sanchez Jasmin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Won Helen, against Bundy Auto Sales, Hubbard Deborah Sue, represented by Herzog Michael Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time475 days |
COMPLAINT- PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 06, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Receipt
Date: March 06, 2017Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 14, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.