Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Khudanyan Ovsanna, Pardchumyan Gevorg, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Akopyan Arsine Esq., Grun Arsine Esq., against Barnett Donna, represented by Lafer Marc S. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Before Trial - Lack Of Prosecution |
Case Cycle Time638 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES SET ONE;AND ETC.
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Gevorg Pardchumyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Gevorg Pardchumyan (Plaintiff); Ovsanna Khudanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Gevorg Pardchumyan (Plaintiff); Ovsanna Khudanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Gevorg Pardchumyan (Plaintiff); Ovsanna Khudanyan (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Donna Barnett (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 24, 2018Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Notice Filed by Donna Barnett (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: October 24, 2018Answer Filed by Donna Barnett (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Donna Barnett (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Jury Trial) of 10/24/2018)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.