Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Easton Michael, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Glaser Joel, Seyfnia Farzad, Zakhary Patrick, against Barlow Melissa, Kentwood Properties Inc, Khayr Lama, represented by Babaian Pierro H., Safarian Harry A., Safarian Harry A. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Lisa Hart Cole presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management644 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions387 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:1N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Joel Gla...)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Melissa Barlow (Defendant); Lama Khayr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Melissa Barlow (Defendant); Lama Khayr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael Easton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MELISSA BARLOW (Defendant); LAMA KHAYR (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Transfer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Document:Statement - General Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Document:Request for Entry of Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Order for Publication Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Melissa Barlow (Defendant); Lama Khayr (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Melissa Barlow (Defendant); Lama Khayr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Document:Appl & Ord to Publish Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Melissa Barlow (Defendant); Lama Khayr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Document:Appl & Ord to Publish Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Melissa Barlow (Defendant); Lama Khayr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Melissa Barlow (Defendant); Lama Khayr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Document:Ntc of Removal to Federal Court Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: MICHAEL EASTON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Michael Easton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Melissa Barlow (Defendant); Lama Khayr (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael Easton (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Notice of Motion - And Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Opposition - To Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil -
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel -
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR: 1. RETALIATORY EVICTION IN VIOLATION OF CCP 1942.5; ETC
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Joel Gla...)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00DEFENDANT MELISSA BARLOWS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;AND ETC.
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Notice - Of Demurrer To First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MELISSA BARLOW?S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Complaint -
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:001N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Order for Publication
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL COATS )
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel (further resp to special interrog, set one; request for prodct of docts; sanctions )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION )
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Statement - General (separate in support of motion to compel further resp to special interrog, set one )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Statement - General
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice (of re-setting hearing )
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Transfer
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Transfer
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Notice (OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER )
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Motion (AND MOTION TO STRIKE )
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; )
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Joel Gla...))
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00in Department O
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Regarding case management conference)
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Answer of Defendants Lamar Khayr and Melissa Barlow
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: June 16, 2020Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/17/2020)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.