Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Smith Shirley Lavern, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nalbandyan Harry Esq, against The Mission Studion Inc, The Mission, Pardee Tamra, Pardee Michael C., Kim Nali, (total of 6) See All represented by Freed Leesa A. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions171 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time519 days |
Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: July 14, 2017Complaint
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Receipt
Date: January 19, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: June 27, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.