Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cardona Maria, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Azizi David, Mesaros Christopher, Ghermezian Raymond, against Goris Al, Sam'S West Inc, represented by D'Angelo Bron Erik, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time763 days |
Motion in Limine - to Exclude Testimony of Brian King (No. 11)
Date: October 01, 2018Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sam's West, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: status of case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sam's West, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: notiice of settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00[Proposed] Joint Witness List; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial; Filed by: Sam's West, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Sam's West, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Sam's West, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00[Proposed] Joint Jury Instructions; Filed by:
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00[Proposed] Joint witness list; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Re: Trial Setting Conference; Filed by: Sam's West, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Document:Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Joint Chart of Page Line Designations(s) used in Lieu of Live Testimony; Filed by:
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: notice of settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Sam's West, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Sam's West, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Opposition To Ex Parte Application; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff); Sam's West, Inc (Defendant)
Date: October 12, 2022Opposition PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; Filed by: Sam's West, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: August 28, 2020) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00[Proposed] Joint Statement of Case; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Memorandum - Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sam's West, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00[Proposed] Joint exhibit list; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Sam's West, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Maria Cardona (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine - to Exclude Testimony of Andrew Morris (No. 10)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine - to Exclude Testimony of Arthur Kreitenberg (No.12)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF RE DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE 9 THROUGH 13
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR O...)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERSONAL INJURIES BASED ON: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine - to Exclude Witnesses frmo Improper Character Evidence (6 of 8)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Other - - Separate Statement ISO Motion
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel - plaintiff's responses to form interrogatories
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Declaration - ISO Motion
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted -
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment -
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Notice - Of Taking Motions off Calendar
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND THE TRIAL DATE
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF RE DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE I THROUGH 8
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine - to Exclude Medical Expenses Not Paid (1 of 8)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice - of Rescheduling of Hearing re: Defendant Sam's West, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine - to Exclude Opinions Not Given at Deposition (3 of 8)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine - to Preclude "Reptile Theory" (2 of 8)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine MIL 13 - EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF ARTHUR KREITENBERG, M.D.
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine - to Exclude Reference to Sam's West's Size, Profits or Financial Condition (7 of 8)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine - to Exclude Evidence of Post Incident Photos and Remedial Measures (4 of 8)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine - to Preclude Arguing "Failure to Take Responsibility" (8 of 8)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine - to Exclude Witnesses from Courtroom before testifying (5 of 8)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine - to Exclude Testimony of Brad Avrit (No. 9)
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00[Proposed] Joint Witness List
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00[Proposed] Joint exhibit list
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Notice (of non opposition by plaintiff re defendant's motions in limine 1 through 8)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00[Proposed] Joint Statement of Case
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00[Proposed] Joint witness list
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 13 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF ARTHUR KREITENBERG, M.D.)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice ([Proposed] Joint Chart of Page/Line Designation(s) Used in Lieu of Live Testimony)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF RE DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE 9 THROUGH 13)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application For ...))
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application Plai...))
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice (Joint Chart of Page Line Designation Used in Lieu of Live Testimony)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Defendant Sam's West, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs Ex Parte to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an order to continue tria...))
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an order to continue tria...) of )
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: trial))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: status of case) of )
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to continue tria...))
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling on OSC Re: Dismissal)
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Trial to March 2, 2020)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: status of case))
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an order to continue tria...))
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to continue tria...) of )
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement))
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: August 28, 2020))
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: notice of settlement) of )
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: trial))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to continue the ...))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: August 28, 2020) of )
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Notice of Motion and Motion for o...))
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Motion for Order (FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CAL. CIV. PROC. CODE 5 473)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Hearing on Mo...))
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00[Proposed] Joint Statement of Case
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00[Proposed] Joint Witness List
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Notice (of non opposition by plaintiff re defendant's motions in limine 1 through 8)
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00[Proposed] Joint exhibit list
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00[Proposed] Joint witness list
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 13 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF ARTHUR KREITENBERG, M.D.)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application For ...))
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice (Joint Chart of Page Line Designation Used in Lieu of Live Testimony)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF RE DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE 9 THROUGH 13)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application Plai...))
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice ([Proposed] Joint Chart of Page/Line Designation(s) Used in Lieu of Live Testimony)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an order to continue tria...))
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For an order to continue tria...))
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S 10/17/19 EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to continue tria...))
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Trial to March 2, 2020)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: status of case) of 05/18/2021)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: status of case))
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: trial))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: notice of settlement) of 09/20/2021)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling on OSC Re: Dismissal)
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to continue the ...))
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: August 28, 2020) of 08/05/2020)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: trial))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: August 28, 2020))
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement))
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Motion for Order (FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CAL. CIV. PROC. CODE 5 473)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.