Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Hallas Joseph, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lovasz Christopher M., against Fca Us Llc, Glenn E. Thomas Company Inc, represented by Nixon Peabody Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gail Ruderman Feuer presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2017 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions122 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time84 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00DEFENDANT FCA US LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 01, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 27, 2017Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 14, 2017Answer
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.