Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Haase Terri, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Nelson Daniel L. Esq., against Salon Bella Inc., Rabii Fahimeh, Fahimeh Hair Salon Inc., represented by Carron Paul A. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2017 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time616 days |
Summons
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-06 00:00:00
Date: July 06, 2018Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: May 11, 2018Complaint
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: May 11, 2018Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: July 05, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: October 11, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: September 28, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-07-20 00:00:00
Date: July 20, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.