Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ekpo Ekaete Samuel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Emrani Jacob, against Geng Yuanyuan, Hai Ning Li, represented by Hurley Beth, Myers Jeffrey Cabot, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions747 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: notice of settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: May 05, 2020) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 31, 2020Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ning Li Hai (Defendant); Yuanyuan Geng (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00General Denial; Filed by: Ning Li Hai (Defendant); Yuanyuan Geng (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Ning Li Hai (Defendant); Yuanyuan Geng (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL (Minutes of 07-13-20); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Ekaete Samuel Ekpo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 31, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Ning Li Hai (Defendant); Yuanyuan Geng (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: December 31, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: May 05, 2020) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Ekaete Samuel Ekpo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: May 05, 2020)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Ekaete Samuel Ekpo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Ekaete Samuel Ekpo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Ekaete Samuel Ekpo (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Summons Filed by Ekaete Samuel Ekpo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: December 31, 2020Association of Attorney Filed by Ning Li Hai (Defendant); Yuanyuan Geng (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Proof Of Service Of Summons Filed by Ekaete Samuel Ekpo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00General Denial Filed by Ning Li Hai (Defendant); Yuanyuan Geng (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL ((Minutes of 07-13-20)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: notice of settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: December 31, 2020Stipulation - No Order (Joint Stipulation) Filed by Ekaete Samuel Ekpo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL (4-2-20 minute order to counsel for plaintiff) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Joint Stipulation)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: May 05, 2020) of 04/02/2020)
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: notice of settlement) of 07/13/2020)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL ((Minutes of 07-13-20))
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL (4-2-20 minute order to counsel for plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal))
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Proof Of Service Of Summons
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: May 05, 2020))
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.