Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Singh Ram P., Singh Ram Pyare, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Regents Of The University Of California, represented by Ottaiano Ric. C. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management90 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions419 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Case Cycle Time419 days |
Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Designation of Record on Appeal Filed by: Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Order Plaintiff's Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 02, 2018Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B289600; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 25, 2020Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Motion to Strike) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Order - Order Plaintiff's Motion to Tax Costs
Date: November 02, 2018Motion for an Order Filed by Regents of the University of California, (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Regents of the University of California, (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Regents of the University of California, (Defendant)
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Ram Pyare Singh (Plaintiff); Ram P. Singh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Stipulation Filed by Regents of the University of California, (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Ram Pyare Singh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Motion to Strike) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B289600) Filed by Clerk
Date: November 25, 2020Notice of Appeal Filed by Ram Pyare Singh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Order (Plaintiff's Motion to Tax Costs) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by Regents of the University of California, (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal Filed by Ram Pyare Singh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Order Filed by Regents of the University of California, (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Regents of the University of California, (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Ram Pyare Singh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : Motion to Strike))
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Motion to Strike) of 10/24/2018)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Order (Plaintiff's Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.