Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gonzalez Salvador, Hernandez Maisy, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Brusavich Bruce M., Brusavich Bruce Michael Esq., Rowley Nicholas Charles, Mcglynn Nahid Abdalah Esq., against Banafsheh Yafeh M.D. Doe 2, Cardin Jr John P. Medical Doctor, Ignacio Marcos Carrillo-Nunez M.D. Doe 3, Long Beach Memorial Medical Centerdism, Pahl Michael M.D. Doe 1 Dismissed, (total of 5) See All represented by Cole Pedroza Llp, Mason Jamie A. Esq., Rubaum David Jonathan Esq., Handlin Rebecca Tomoko Esq., Kogen Rachael Charow Esq., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Georgina T. Rizk presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 19, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions385 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: November 16, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: November 16, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 08, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANT MICHAEL A. PAHL, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFF CALENDAR
Date: September 20, 2017Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4
Date: February 26, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2
Date: February 26, 2019Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1
Date: February 26, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL #3
Date: January 31, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL #1
Date: January 31, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL # 4
Date: January 31, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MIL #2
Date: January 31, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: February 20, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: February 20, 2020COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC
Date: October 19, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: October 31, 2016ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: November 21, 2016ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: March 09, 2017ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, JOHN P. CARDIN, JR., M.D., TO PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL COMPLAINT
Date: December 05, 2016ANSWER OF DEFENDANT IGNACIO M. CARRILLO-NUNEZ, M.D., TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: April 26, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: April 26, 2017Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of James A. Chortanian)
Date: December 07, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Bruce M. Brusavich)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Nahid A. McGlynn)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Goonjan Shah, M.D.)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial per Stipulation of the Parties)
Date: December 07, 2021Ex Parte Application (for an Order Continuing Trial Pursuant to Stipulation of the Parties)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application , Filed by the Plaintiffs for...))
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: August 17, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Ex-Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Joseph P. Cardin, Jr., M.D.'s Ex Parte ...))
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (To Continue Trial - Per Ex-Parte)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant, John P. Cardin, Jr., M.D.'s Ex-Parte Ap...))
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #2)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Remaining Defendant, John P. Cardin, Jr., M.D.); ...))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL # 4)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation for Protective Order)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Request for Accommodations;) of 03/11/2020)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant, John P. Cardin, Jr., M.D.'s Ex Parte Ap...))
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference (Remaining Defendant, John P. Cardin,...))
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #3)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL #1)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/17/2020)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Declaration (Of Jamie A. Mason, Esq. in support of Ex parte)
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of John P. Cardin Jr., M.D.)
Date: December 07, 2021in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.