Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gutierrez Gumersinda, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Baldwin-Kennedy Ronda N. Esq., against Ornelas Louie A. Jr., Ornelas Romelia Gutierrez, represented by Valentine R. S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth Allen White presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 13, 2016 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1012 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1012 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 26, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 27, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL
Date: March 08, 2017COMPLAINT FOR FRAUD, MISREPRESENTATION, FRAUDULENT CONCEALMENT, AND CONSTRUCTIVE FRAUD
Date: October 13, 2016Complaint
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: July 22, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-06-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: July 15, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial
Date: July 15, 2019Stipulation
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial - Five Day Estimate))
Date: July 22, 2019Order
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: July 16, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-07-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.