Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Martinez Medari Jamileth Rodriguez, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Matern Matthew J. Esq., against Allink Inc., Cake Salon Bosco Inc., Delizia Inc., Kwak Family Trust Doe 1, Mr.Bosco Brandon Kwakerroneously Sued As, (total of 7) See All represented by Ryu Thomas J. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rupert A. Byrdsong presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management175 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2016 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions151 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time896 days |
Proof of Service -
Date: January 19, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: February 23, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: March 09, 2018Proof of Service -
Date: March 14, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS' FINANCIAL CONDITION; ETC.
Date: January 30, 2018NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE RE: FEBRUARY 13, 2018 MOTION FOR AN ORDER
Date: February 13, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions)
Date: November 07, 2018COMPLAINT FOR: 1. SEXUAL BATTERY (CIVIL CODE ? 1708.5); ETC
Date: September 29, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: November 28, 2016NOTICE OF LODGEMENT OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 21, 2017JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER
Date: March 23, 2017AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: October 25, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY KWAK FAMILY REVOCABLE TRUST
Date: March 02, 2018Complaint
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-02 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Shortening Time)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Order (tentative ruling adopted as final order)
Date: November 07, 2018Declaration (of Brittany Gibson in support of ex parte)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening time...))
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: December 13, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: March 14, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: December 10, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 23, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.