Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Akhamzadeh Ehteram, Akhamzadeh Mashallah, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carpenter John C., Carpenter John Charles, Saidian Saidian, against Alvandian Vrej, Beverly Hills Cab Company Incorporated, Beverly Hills Transit Cooperative Inc., Beverly Hills Transit Coop. Inc., Seddinghmanesh Mashallah, (total of 6) See All represented by Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara Llp, Brenner Keith G., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gerald Rosenberg presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial446 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions147 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Conditional Settlement) |
Case Cycle Time847 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 26, 2016Proof of Service -
Date: October 26, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: January 26, 2017THIRD AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: February 02, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: August 22, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 16, 2017Proof of Service -
Date: September 01, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 01, 2017REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE (CCP SECTION 36)
Date: October 26, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE (CCP SECTION 36); ETC.
Date: October 26, 2016ORDER RE: MOTION FOR PREFERENCE
Date: November 30, 2016NOTICE OF RULING RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE (CCP ? 36)
Date: December 06, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE (CCP ? 36); ETC.
Date: February 22, 2017ORDER RE: MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE
Date: April 24, 2017NOTICE OF RULING RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE
Date: April 26, 2017ORDER RE: MOTION TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: May 26, 2017NOTICE OF ,MOTION AND MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE (CCP 36); ETC.
Date: May 30, 2017REPLY MEMORANDUM TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE (CC? ? 36)
Date: June 28, 2017ORDER RE: MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE
Date: July 06, 2017NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE
Date: July 13, 2017ORDER RE: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: August 22, 2017PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT VREJ ALVANDIAN'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; ETC
Date: September 12, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC
Date: September 20, 2017ORDER RE: DEMURRER; MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 26, 2017ORDER RE: MOTION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE A FAC
Date: November 22, 2017PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC
Date: January 19, 2018Motion to Dismiss -
Date: July 24, 2018Opposition - To Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: July 31, 2018Opposition - To Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 31, 2018Reply - To Opposition to Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 09, 2018Motion in Limine - No. 11
Date: September 07, 2018Motion in Limine - No. 10
Date: September 07, 2018Motion in Limine - No. 8
Date: September 07, 2018Motion in Limine - No. 7
Date: September 07, 2018Motion in Limine - No. 6
Date: September 07, 2018Motion in Limine - No. 5
Date: September 07, 2018Motion in Limine - No. 2
Date: September 07, 2018Motion in Limine - No. 12
Date: September 07, 2018Motion in Limine - No. 3
Date: September 07, 2018Motion in Limine - No. 4
Date: September 07, 2018Motion to Bifurcate -
Date: September 07, 2018Motion in Limine - No. 1
Date: September 07, 2018COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC.
Date: September 28, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: December 13, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: December 20, 2016ANSWER OF BEVERLY HILLS TRANSIT COOPERATIVE, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: May 30, 2017AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: July 31, 2017DEFENDANT, VREJ ALVANDIAN'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; ETC.
Date: September 01, 2017PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC
Date: January 19, 2018Default Entered
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-30T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-06-01T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-08 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:001N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00ANSWER OF VREJ ALVANDIAN TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: September 27, 2017DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.
Date: December 27, 2017Complaint
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-30 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-04 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-12-22T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:001N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Motion (FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE )
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE )
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice (OF CMC )
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Opposition (PLFS' OPPOSITION TO BEVERLY HILLS TRANSIT COOP. EX PARTE APP )
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Reply (MEMORANDUM TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE )
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SEVER ISSUES FOR TRIAL )
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Separate Statement of Und. Facts
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CMC )
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTORITIES )
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGT )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Declaration ( DECL OF JACQUELINE A. MARCOTT )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (DEFT VREJ ALVANDIAN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Declaration ( DECL OF VREJ ALVANDIAN )
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTD TO 6-26-18 8:30 AM DEPT K )
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Ex-parte Request for Order
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Ex-parte Request for Order ( plaintiff's ex parte application for setting of a trial date )
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Objection (TO EVIDENCE CRC 3.1354 )
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Declaration (OF EHTERAM AKHAMZADEH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF )
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Separate Statement of Und. Facts
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (LISA MARIE PARKER CSR 13441 )
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (WIL WILCOX CSR#9178 )
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-04 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Separate Statement of Und. Facts
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS EIGHT CAUSE OF ACTION PURSUANT TO CCP 1780 (d) )
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Objection (TO EVIDENCE )
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION )
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (CARMEN YOUNG CSR #3436 )
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#10 - TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS' EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING AS TO MATTERS OF LAW )
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#11 - TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCT TO AND TESTIMONY FROM NON PARTY URIK HOVSEPIAN )
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem ((OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE: LISA MARIE PARKER, LICENSE #13441) )
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (DEFENDANTS BEVERLY HILLS TRANSIT AND ALVANDIAN'S APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL )
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause
Date: October 01, 2018Notice of Settlement
Date: September 28, 2018Notice-Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE )
Date: September 28, 2018Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg.))
Date: November 15, 2018Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal : OSC-Failure to File Dismi...))
Date: January 23, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.