Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Melamed Samira, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Law Office Of Jacob K. Kashani A.P.C., against General Motors Llc, represented by Ruben David N. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael L. Stern Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management100 days |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2016 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial369 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time301 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: October 26, 2016COMPLAINT 1. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY; ETC
Date: September 28, 2016Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 26, 2017Receipt
Date: February 14, 2017Complaint
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: January 06, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.