Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Thomas Carmelita, Thomas Hashim, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Timothy J. Ryan & Associates, against Meaza Sewasew, Tarick Merssa Dereje Doe 1, represented by Chidi Elizabeth M. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2016 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time561 days |
Proof of Service -
Date: March 09, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: March 09, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY - NEGLIGENCE)
Date: September 26, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: December 08, 2016Notice of Settlement
Date: March 01, 2018Answer
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Receipt
Date: September 27, 2017Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: March 09, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 10, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.