Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Plisse Usa Inc., filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley, against Hill Sheila, Launch Usa International Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2016 |
CategoryOther Contract Dispute (Not Breach/Insurance/Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time179 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 18, 2016COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF
Date: September 30, 2016ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S VERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 09, 2017Demurrer
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 22, 2017Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 28, 2017Notice of Settlement
Date: February 16, 2017Notice of Related Case
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.