Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Anderson & Associates, Kyundibekyan Karapet, Kyundibekyan Vardan, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Serpik Andrei V., against Advanced Business Conglomerate Inc. Dba Benevolent Home Care, Phillips Shawn Dba Benevolent Home Care, Reese Roshann Dba Benevolent Home Care, Benevolent Home Care, represented by Aguilar Margaret Hope, Neuville Stewart James Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Steven J. Kleifield presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management144 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial643 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1103 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1103 days |
Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Karapet Kyundibekyan (Plaintiff); Vardan Kyundibekyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Cross-Comp Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant AXD
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order: Statement of Decision) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid APPELLANT PAID $686.77; Filed by:
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;B302665, NOA ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Appeal Document B302665 Turndown Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 3 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed ); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Affidavit for Rlse Funds/Req for Payment Rptr Appeal Trnscpt; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B302665; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 07, 2022Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Document:OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: ATTORNEY for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter K. Darlene Lewis CSR 13534; Filed by:
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Document:First Amended Cross Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Karapet Kyundibekyan (Plaintiff); Vardan Kyundibekyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Tentative Decision on Application for Right to Attach Order: Denied; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 10, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPLY; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; ETC.
Date: November 16, 2017VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) FRAUDULENT MISREPRESENTATION; ETC.
Date: September 15, 2016NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: December 23, 2016REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2017NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CR0SS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2017CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2017REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: December 08, 2017CROSS-DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO THE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 09, 2018OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00FINANCIAL STATEMENT OF SHAWN PHILLIPS
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00FINANCIAL STATEMENT OF ROSHANN REESE
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-05 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Opposition to Application for Right to Attach Order and Claim Exemption
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Notice OF OPPOSITION
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Tentative Decision on Application for Right to Attach Order: Denied
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00First Amended Cross Complaint
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Cross-Comp
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Document:Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (PLAINTIFF?S SECOND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Notice (of Plaintiffs / Cross-Defendants' Designation of Transcript of Radger Eugenio)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiffs' Closing Brief)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Reply ( Brief in Support of Closing Argument)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Statement of Decision
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Judgment) of 09/23/2019)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order: Statement of Decision))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Reply ( Sur-Reply Brief in Support of Closing Argument)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/09/2019)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Objection ( TO THE [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants' Closing Trial Brief)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Request for Statement of Decision
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Closing Brief)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Tentative Ruling
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00DEFENDANTS / CROSS-COMPLAINANTS CLOSING ARGUMENT
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Objection (DEFENDANTS / CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' OBJECTIONS TO THE STATEMENT OF DECISION)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/30/2019)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/13/2019)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: Statement of Decision) of 07/26/2019)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Reply (to Objection to Statement of Decision)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Judgment (Judgment)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid (Appellant)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00DEFENDANTS / CROSS-COMPLAINANTS' PROPOSALS AS TO THE CONTENT OF THE STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:11/22/19)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Judgment))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Order (ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CORRECT THE COURT RECORD/DOCKET)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER TO CORRECT THE C...))
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B302665, NOA 11/22/19;)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Brief (Deposition of Radger T.C. Euginio)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 3 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed 11/22/19)
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Respondent's Ntc Designating Record of Appeal
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal (11/22/19 B302665)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE DEFENDANTS'.EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CORRECT THE COURT RECORDiDOCKET)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.