Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Diaz Sasha, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Law Offices Of Jack Perko, against Artful Home Care Llc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management86 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2016 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time400 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: January 23, 2017COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION BASED ON: I) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC
Date: September 13, 2016DEFENDANT ARTFUL HOME CARE, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: October 27, 2016Answer
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-13 00:00:00
Date: February 13, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: October 18, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-20 00:00:00
Date: September 20, 2017Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-29 00:00:00
Date: January 29, 2018Minute order entered: 2017-12-06 00:00:00
Date: December 06, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.