Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jenni Rivera Enterprises Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dugdale Robert Edward, against Balaguer Luis, Btf Media Llc, Dhana Media Inc., Latin World Entertainment Holdings Inc., Salgado Pete, (total of 5) See All represented by Brettler Andrew Brad, King Howard Ernest, Sammataro James George, Jonelis Crystal Yvonne, Niborski Michael, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management316 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
DECLARATION OF SUSANNAH M. ROONEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY
Date: November 08, 2016EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXPEDITE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY; ETC
Date: November 10, 2016DEFENDANT PETE SALGADO'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY; ETC
Date: November 18, 2016DEFENDANT PETE SALGADO'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY; ETC.
Date: November 21, 2016RULING RE: ANTI-SLAPP MOTIONS
Date: December 21, 2016NOTICE OF RULING RE: ANTI-SLAPP MOTIONS
Date: December 28, 2016UNIVISION NETWORKS & STUDIOS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE
Date: January 13, 2017OPPOSITION TO UNIVISION NETWORKS & STUDIOS INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE
Date: January 25, 2017RULING RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE
Date: February 07, 2017UNIVISION NETWORKS & STUDIOS, INC.?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE
Date: January 31, 2017Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: December 05, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: October 16, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATES FOR MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: January 11, 2021Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATES FOR MOTIONS TO COMPEL
Date: February 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATES FOR MOTIONS TO COMPEL
Date: March 23, 2021COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC
Date: September 12, 2016PROOFS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND OTHER DOCUMENTS
Date: October 19, 2016Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 05, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 16, 2020Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Document:Joinder Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Document:Notice of Designation of Record Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Intervenor APIV
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Intervenor APIV
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Designation of Record Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Document:Motion for Leave Filed by: Attorney for Intervenor APIV
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Intervenor APIV
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Designation of Record Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Designation of Record Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Appellant
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Document:Remittitur Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Document:Remittitur Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Document:Designation of Record on Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Respondent
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Document:Lodge Transcript/Record Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Intervenor APIV
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Other - Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded. B279739; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Pete Salgado (Defendant); As to: Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: BTF Media, LLC (Defendant); As to: Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Latin World Entertainment Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Court
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Intervenor
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by Plaintiff/Appellant
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Application Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by BTF Media, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record Filed by BTF Media, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Motion for Leave Filed by Intervenor
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Notice Filed by BTF Media, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Order Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Notice Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Reply to Motion Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Notice Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal Filed by Respondent
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Stipulation Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Unknown Document Type Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) ((9457)) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by BTF Media, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Separate Statement ((5582)) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice (of Intent to Appear by Telephone) Filed by BTF Media, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: July 07, 2021Minute Order ((Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert E. Dugdale in Support (3704)) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: July 02, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) ((9885)) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Other (- Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded. B279739) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Separate Statement ((9457)) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY VIDEO/TELEPHONE) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Separate Statement ((3235)) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) ((7662)) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) ((5582)) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) ((3704)) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Separate Statement ((7662)) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) ((3235)) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) ((2248)) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert E. Dugdale in Support (2248)) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-06 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Declaration of Robert E. Dugdale in Support; Filed by: Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: BTF Media, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by BTF Media, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Declaration Filed by BTF Media, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by Latin World Entertainment Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Joinder Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Order Filed by Latin World Entertainment Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Intervenor
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Notice Filed by BTF Media, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Intervenor
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Intervenor
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Latin World Entertainment Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Latin World Entertainment Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Appeal Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Pete Salgado (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by BTF Media, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Notice Filed by BTF Media, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by BTF Media, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration Filed by Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-10 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-05 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-14T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-21 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Ntc to Reptr/Mon to Prep Transcrpt
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Unknown Document Type
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Notice ( of Continuance of Status Conference and Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Unknown Document Type
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Other (- Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded. B279739)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference))
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel (AND TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED (9885))
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel (PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS WITHOUT OBJECTION (2248))
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Status Conference and Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert E. Dugdale in Support (3704))
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) ((2248))
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) ((9885))
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel (ANSWERS TO FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES WITHOUT OBJECTION (3704))
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Robert E. Dugdale in Support (2248))
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) ((3704))
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Protective Order)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Notice (of Intent to Appear by Telephone)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.