Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Damavandi Jeff, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Richard A. Kolber Law Offices Of, against Realty Escrow Corporation, represented by Relaw Apc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management107 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions187 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time338 days |
COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE
Date: August 31, 2016ORDER RE: DEFENDAN'?S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 06, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-02-16T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Opposition Points & Authorities
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-02-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 04, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: August 03, 2017Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: April 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Realty Escrow Corporation (Defendant) |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMA11ON | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 50 (Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 50 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AND; RETAINING JURISDICTION PER C.C.P. SECTION 664.6 TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND REQUEST THAT COURT RETAIN JURISDICTION PER C.C.P. SECTION 664.6 TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 13 Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.